EP2200243 - System and method for providing broadcast services in broadband wireless access system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161, Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-si 305-700 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Electronics and Telecommunications Research Institute 161, Gajeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-si 305-700 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Chul 514-1210, Cheongsol Apt., Songgang-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon-si / KR | 02 /
Lee, Sang-ho 803-301, Daedeok Techno Valley 8 danji Apt., 896, Gwanpyeong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon-si / KR | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09179463.6 | 16.12.2009 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | KR20080131577 | 22.12.2008 Original published format: KR 20080131577 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2200243 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
H04L27/26 (EP,US);
H04N21/43 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Rundfunkdiensten in einem drahtlosen Breitbandzugangssystem | [2010/25] | English: | System and method for providing broadcast services in broadband wireless access system | [2010/25] | French: | Système et procédé pour fournir des services de diffusion dans un système d'accès sans fil | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |