Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2335686

EP2335686 - An aqueous intravenous nanosuspension with reduced adverse effects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  09.12.2011
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 11.01.2012  [2012/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEK Pharmaceuticals d.d.
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
[2011/25]
Representative(s)Kosak, Alenka
Verovskova 57
1526 Ljubljana / SI
[2011/25]
Application number, filing date09180127.421.12.2009
[2011/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2335686
Date:22.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/107, A61K9/00, A61K47/10, A61K47/26, A61K31/343
[2011/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/25]
TitleGerman:Wässrige intravenöse Nanosuspension mit minimalen Nebenwirkungen[2011/25]
English:An aqueous intravenous nanosuspension with reduced adverse effects[2011/25]
French:Nanosuspension intraveineuse aqueuse dotée d'effets indésirables diminués[2011/25]
Examination procedure24.08.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2012/02]
03.09.2011Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/02]
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5726164  (WEDER HANS GEORG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 19 - line 64 * * column 4, line 18 - line 32 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 13 * * column 7, line 10 - line 26 * * example 2 *;
 [XYI]WO0122937  (SONUS PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-11,13-15 * example 3 * * page 6, line 11 - line 27 * * page 15, line 1 - line 11 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 4,7,12;
 [XI]WO0226324  (SONUS PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,8-11,13-15 * page 6, line 11 - line 30 * * page 5, line 23 - line 27 * * page 7, line 1 - line 5 * * page 7, line 27 - line 32 * * example 2 * [I] 2,4,7,12;
 [A]WO0209671  (UNIV FLORIDA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0835105
 US5234949
 US6143778
 US6479541
 US7067143
 US6869939
    GOUGH ET AL., "Hypotensive Action of Commercial Intravenous Amiodarone and Polysorbate 80 in Dogs", JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (1982), pages 375 - 380,