Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2093666

EP2093666 - Implant revision recognition by exchanging the revision data during transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.07.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Codman Neuro Sciences Sàrl
rue Girardet 29
2400 Le Locle / CH
[2009/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Crivelli, Rocco
Via Le Giuseppe Motta 32A
6500 Bellinzona / CH
02 / Ginggen, Alec
6 Murray Street
Massachusetts 02360 / US
 [2009/35]
Representative(s)Tunstall, Christopher Stephen , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Tunstall, Christopher Stephen , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2009/35]Tunstall, Christopher Stephen , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date09250414.118.02.2009
[2009/35]
Priority number, dateUS2008007061819.02.2008         Original published format: US 70618
[2009/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2093666
Date:26.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/445, A61N1/372
[2009/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/35]
TitleGerman:Implantatrevisionserkennung durch Austauschen der Revisionsdaten während der Übertragung[2009/35]
English:Implant revision recognition by exchanging the revision data during transmission[2009/35]
French:Reconnaissance de révision d'implant par échange de données de révision pendant la transmission[2009/35]
Examination procedure29.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/10]
23.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2014Date of oral proceedings
11.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
11.06.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination21.08.2014Appeal received No.  T2133/14
21.10.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.02.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005240246  (LEE MICHAEL T [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1,13,14 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0019] , [0026] , [0031] , [0032] , [0036] , [0037] , [0039] , [0040] , [0048] , [0051] *;
 [X]WO0147597  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 4 * * claims 1,3-5,15,18 *;
 [X]WO0070889  (MEDTRONIC PHYSIO CONTROL MFG [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1,6,9,20,45 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [DA]US5800473  (FAISANDIER YVES [FR]) [DA] * the whole document *
by applicantUS5800473