blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2107549

EP2107549 - Liquid crystal display module [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.08.2014
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.09.2014  [2014/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2009/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Daisuke
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / Kida, Yoshitoshi
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / Takeuchi, Takeya
c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
04 / Pusey, David
21 Feld Way Lychpit Basingstoke
Hampshire, RG24 8UW / GB
05 / Shadwell, Peter
8 Meiter Close Bramley Tadley
Hampshire, RG26 5NQ / GB
 [2009/41]
Representative(s)Smith, Samuel Leonard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/41]Smith, Samuel Leonard
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date09250779.720.03.2009
[2009/41]
Priority number, dateGB2008000619304.04.2008         Original published format: GB 0806193
[2009/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2107549
Date:07.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2107549
Date:22.09.2010
[2010/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.2010
ClassificationIPC:G09G3/36
[2009/41]
CPC:
G09G3/3655 (EP,US); G02F1/136286 (GB); G09G3/3614 (EP,GB,US);
G02F1/134318 (EP,US); G09G2300/0426 (EP,US); G09G2320/0209 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/41]
TitleGerman:Flüssigkristallanzeigenmodul[2009/41]
English:Liquid crystal display module[2009/41]
French:Module d'affichage à cristaux liquides[2009/41]
Examination procedure21.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/17]
23.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/36]
29.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201406   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002154084  (TANAKA YUKIO [JP], et al);
 [A]US2002180899  (LIN SHENG-HSIEN [TW], et al);
 [A]US2003095091  (ENOMOTO HIROMI [JP], et al);
 [A]US2007166860  (TANAKA YUKIO [JP], et al)
ExaminationUS2005162363
 US2005253829
by applicantUS2002154084
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.