Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2138106

EP2138106 - Multi lumen access port [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/01]Multi-Lumen Access Port
[2013/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2012/52]
Former [2010/01]For all designated states
Tyco Healthcare Group LP
60 Middletown Avenue
North Haven, CT 06473 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wingardner III, Thomas
50 Mansfield Road
North Haven, CT 06473 / US
02 / Stellon, Gene A.
101 Duane Lane
Burlington, CT 06013 / US
03 / De Santis, Robert J.
67 Sport Hill Road
Redding, CT 06896 / US
 [2017/31]
Former [2010/01]01 / Wingardner III, Thomas
50 Mansfield Road
CT 06473 North Haven / US
02 / Stellon, Gene A
101, Duane Lane
CT 06013 Burlington / US
03 / De Santis, Robert J
67 Sport Hill Road
CT 06896 Redding / US
Representative(s)Soames, Candida Jane , et al
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[2017/31]
Former [2011/45]Soames, Candida Jane , et al
Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP
10 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB
Former [2010/01]Soames, Candida Jane
Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB
Application number, filing date09251600.419.06.2009
[2010/01]
Priority number, dateUS2008007554225.06.2008         Original published format: US 75542
US2009046836319.05.2009         Original published format: US 468363
[2010/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2138106
Date:30.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/53]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2138106
Date:03.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2138106
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/00, A61B17/34
[2010/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/31]
Former [2010/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zugangsöffnung mit mehreren Lumen[2010/01]
English:Multi lumen access port[2013/16]
French:Port d'accès multi-lumières[2010/01]
Former [2010/01]Multi-Lumen Access Port
Examination procedure07.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/08]
14.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2017Fee for grant paid
06.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17174769.4  / EP3235442
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.02.2017
Opposition(s)03.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
04.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
22.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
[2019/15]
Former [2018/39]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3299883  (RUBENS HARRY S) [X] 1,2,6 * column 1, line 56 - column 3, line 9; figures 1-5 * [Y] 3-5;
 [XI]US6669674  (MACOVIAK JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 8, line 42 - column 9, line 10; figure 11 * [I] 5;
 [X]US4016884  (KWAN-GETT CLIFFORD S) [X] 1 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 39; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2007299387  (WILLIAMS MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1-2e *;
 [Y]US2007049966  (BONADIO FRANK [IE], et al) [Y] 3-5 * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0131]; figures 1, 2, 11 *;
 [A]US2003216748  (GITIS NORM [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantUS20090075542