Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2138117

EP2138117 - Low profile instrument access device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.12.2017  [2017/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2012/52]
Former [2010/01]For all designated states
Tyco Healthcare Group LP
60 Middletown Avenue
North Haven, CT 06473 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gresham, Richard D.
134 East Gate Road
Guilford CT 06437 / US
 [2010/01]
Representative(s)Soames, Candida Jane , et al
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/45]Soames, Candida Jane , et al
Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP
10 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB
Former [2010/01]Soames, Candida Jane
Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB
Application number, filing date09251620.223.06.2009
[2010/01]
Priority number, dateUS20080076170P27.06.2008         Original published format: US 76170 P
US2009046815319.05.2009         Original published format: US 468153
[2010/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2138117
Date:30.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/34
[2010/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Instrumentzugriffsvorrichtung mit niedrigem Profil[2010/01]
English:Low profile instrument access device[2010/01]
French:Dispositif d'accès aux instruments à profil bas[2010/01]
Examination procedure23.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/31]
23.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/51]
16.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/51]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.07.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
04.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201709   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1629787  (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [X] 1,5-10 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4;
 [Y]WO2007093957  (ROESCH THEODOR GERHARD [ZA]) [Y] 2-4 * figure - *;
 [A]WO2007006306  (COLOPLAST AS [DK]; HANSEN MICHAEL [DK]; MUELLEJEANS PETER [DK]; JENSEN) [A] 1-10 * figure - *;
 [A]US5215531  (MAXSON WAYNE S [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * figure - *;
 [X]WO9636283  (GEN SURGICAL INNOVATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1 * figure 2 *
by applicantUS20090076170