Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2273827

EP2273827 - Interference mitigation and avoidance whitin femtocells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2014
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3, avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
[2013/31]
Former [2012/08]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3 avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
Former [2011/02]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Conte, Alberto
c/o Alcatel Lucent
3 Avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
02 / Leclerc, Brice
c/o Alcatel Lucent
3 Avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
 [2012/52]
Former [2011/02]01 / Conte, Alberto
c/o Alcatel Lucent 54 Rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
02 / Leclerc, Brice
c/o Alcatel Lucent 54 Rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Representative(s)Therias, Philippe
Alcatel-Lucent International
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/29]Therias, Philippe
Alcatel-Lucent International
32, avenue Kléber
92700 Colombes / FR
Former [2013/03](deleted)
...
Former [2011/02]Louiset, Raphael
Dejade & Biset 35, rue de Châteaudun
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date09290517.330.06.2009
[2011/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2273827
Date:12.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2273827
Date:31.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02
[2011/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/02]
TitleGerman:Interferenzabschwächung und -vermeidung in Femtozellen[2011/02]
English:Interference mitigation and avoidance whitin femtocells[2011/02]
French:Réduction et évitement des interférences dans des femtocellules[2011/02]
Examination procedure21.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.07.2011Examination requested  [2011/34]
18.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2013Fee for grant paid
12.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.10.2011
Opposition(s)02.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:10.04.2013
[2013/40]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.06.2009
AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MK31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
TR31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU30.06.2009
AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
TR31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2016/32]HU30.06.2009
AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2016/28]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2016/16]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2015/09]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/24]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/23]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/22]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/21]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/18]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/14]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
CY18.09.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/12]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
CY18.09.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/11]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
CY18.09.2013
NO31.10.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/10]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
CY18.09.2013
NO31.10.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/09]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO31.10.2013
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2008131588  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * page 2, line 6 - line 18 * * page 4, line 5 - line 9 * * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 11 * * page 10, line 18 - line 31 * * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 14 * * page 15, line 4 - line 7 * [I] 2-6,8-9;
 [XYI]  - "A method for interference control and power saving for home access point", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20071213), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013122942 [X] 1,3,7-8 * the whole document * [Y] 2 [I] 4-6,9
 [XYI]  - MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC, "Dynamic Setup of HNBs for Energy Savings and Interference Reduction", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-081949 (DYNAMIC SETUP HNBS), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080813), vol. RAN WG3, no. Jeju Island; 20080813, XP050165010 [X] 1,3,7-8 * chapter 2.2 Nodes and interfaces that are involved in the femto-base stations' switching mechanism (pages 3-6) * [Y] 2 [I] 4-6,9
 [XA]  - HUAWEI, "hNB Interference Reduction", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-080188, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080108), vol. RAN WG2, no. Sevilla, Spain; 20080108, XP050138063 [X] 1,7 * chapter 2.3 - chapter 2.4 on page 3 * [A] 2-6,8-9
 [IY]  - ALCATEL-LUCENT, "Capacity and Coverage SON Use case", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-080082_SONCAPA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080205), vol. RAN WG3, no. Sorrento, Italy; 20080205, XP050163314 [I] 1,7 * chapter 2.1 on pages 1-2 * * chapter 2.3 on page 3 * [Y] 2
by applicantWO2008131588