Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2161783

EP2161783 - Method for multi-antenna signal processing at an antenna element arrangement, corresponding transceiver and corresponding antenna element arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.08.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[2018/16]
Former [2014/34]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2012/08]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3 avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
Former [2010/10]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Wild, Thorsten
Franklinstrasse 37
70435 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Ohm, Michael
Taubenheimstrasse 84
70372 Stuttgart / DE
03 / Hoek, Cornelis
Tuebingerstrasse 108
71732 Tamm / DE
 [2010/10]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/31]2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 15 17 23
80050 München / DE
Former [2010/10]Wetzel, Emmanuelle , et al
Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Corporate Standards Lorenzstrasse 10
70435 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date09305054.021.01.2009
[2010/10]
Priority number, dateEP2008029083204.09.2008         Original published format: EP 08290832
[2010/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2161783
Date:10.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/24, H01Q3/26, H01Q21/06, H04B7/04
[2010/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/10]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Signalverarbeitung mit mehreren Antennen an einer Antennenelementanordnung, entsprechendes Sende-Empfangsgerät und entsprechende Antennenelementanordnung[2010/10]
English:Method for multi-antenna signal processing at an antenna element arrangement, corresponding transceiver and corresponding antenna element arrangement[2010/10]
French:Procédé de traitement de signal de plusieurs antennes dans un agencement d'éléments d'antenne, émetteur-récepteur correspondant et agencement d'éléments d'antenne correspondant[2010/10]
Examination procedure27.01.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/10]
26.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.05.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination29.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1951/15
17.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Executiondeleted
[2014/47]
Former [2013/40]ID:01
For:AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Date:10.04.2013
[2014/47]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2007076895  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]; PETERSSON SVEN [SE]; JOHANSSON MARTIN [S) [X] 1,7,9,2-4,8,10-12 * page 6; figure 1b * [Y] 5;
 [A]WO2007091024  (QUINTEL TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]; BARKER DAVID EDWIN [GB]; HASKELL PHILIP E) [A] 1,7,9 * pages 11-13; figure 4 *;
 [PA]US2008318613  (BALACHANDRAN KUMAR [US] ET AL) [PA] 5 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - YANG SONG, LIEYA CAI, KEYING WU, HONGWEI YANG, "Collaborative MIMO, IEEE C802.16m-07/244r1", IEEE 802.16 BROADBAND WIRELESS ACCESS WORKING GROUP, (20071107), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.wirelessman.org/tgm/contrib/, (20090923), XP002547035 [Y] 5 * pages 1-9; figures 1-8 *