Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2198850

EP2198850 - Cosmetic composition containing four types of surfactants and one non-silicone fatty derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 21.06.2017  [2017/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[2010/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Fack, Géraldine
55, rue Louis Rouquier
92300 Levallois-Perret / FR
 [2010/25]
Representative(s)Dossmann, Gérard
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstrasse 71-73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/25]Dossmann, Gérard
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date09306274.318.12.2009
[2010/25]
Priority number, dateFR2008005896522.12.2008         Original published format: FR 0858965
FR2008005896322.12.2008         Original published format: FR 0858963
[2010/25]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2198850
Date:23.06.2010
Language:FR
[2010/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/39, A61K8/44, A61K8/46, A61K8/60, A61K8/92, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12
[2010/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Kosmetische Zusammensetzung enthaltend ein nicht silikoniertes Fettderivat und vier Tenside[2010/25]
English:Cosmetic composition containing four types of surfactants and one non-silicone fatty derivative[2010/25]
French:Composition cosmétique détergente comprenant quatre tensioactifs et un corps gras non siliconé[2010/25]
Examination procedure18.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/25]
13.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
15.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/25]
15.04.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.10.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/25]
Appeal following examination23.06.2014Appeal received No.  T2123/14
21.08.2014Statement of grounds filed
27.10.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
27.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
18.11.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP16195662.8   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 29.11.2016
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.03.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE19710873  (GOLDWELL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 58; example 1; claim - *;
 [Y]EP1321124  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0149]; example 14 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0081] *;
 [Y]DE19530550  (KAO CORP GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 3 - page 4, line 24; examples 4,5; claim - *;
 [Y]DE4409189  (CHEM Y [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 29 - page 4, line 10; example 5; claim - *;
 [Y]DE4302314  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 60 - page 4, line 23; examples B1-B5 *;
 [Y]DE19916335  (SCHWARZKOPF GMBH HANS [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 3 - page 5, line 48 * * page 6, line 57 - line 32; example - *;
 [Y]DE29903970U  (GOLDWELL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 4 * * page 9, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5; example 4 *;
 [A]FR2780278  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 32 - page 8, line 29; example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP1707240  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0077]; examples 1-9 *;
 [A]EP1661976  (KAO CHEMICALS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0073]; examples 2.2.1,2.2.3 *
by applicantUS2528378
 US2781354
 DE4424530
 DE4424533
 DE4402929
 DE4420736
 WO9523807
 EP0646572
 WO9516665
 FR2673179
 EP0227994
 WO9407844
 WO9424097
 WO9410131
 EP0337354
 FR2270846
 FR2383660
 FR2598611
 FR2470596
 FR2519863
 FR2875503
 EP0080976
 FR2077143
 FR2393573
 FR1492597
 US4131576
 FR2162025
 FR2280361
 FR2252840
 FR2368508
 FR1583363
 FR2080759
 FR2190406
 FR2320330
 FR2316271
 FR2336434
 FR2413907
 US2273780
 US2375853
 US2388614
 US2454547
 US3206462
 US2261002
 US2271378
 US3874870
 US4001432
 US3929990
 US3966904
 US4005193
 US4025617
 US4025627
 US4025653
 US4026945
 US4027020
 EP0122324
 US4157388
 US4390689
 US4702906
 US4719282
 WO2007005577
 US5374334
 US6426383
 US6894110
 FR2898603
    - DOWNING, JOURNAL OF LIPID RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 35, pages 2060 - 2068