blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2198850 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2198850



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 387
24.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.05.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
19.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.04.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 23
18.04.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.11.2016 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
18.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.09.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
21.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.10.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
14.10.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.11.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
31.10.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
28.10.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
21.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
21.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
21.08.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.08.2014 Claims Appeal 4
21.08.2014 Claims Appeal 4
21.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.08.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
23.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
23.06.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.04.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Annex to a communication Search / examination 16
15.04.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.04.2014 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
15.04.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
15.04.2014 Means of redress Search / examination 2
15.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.03.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.03.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
28.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
28.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
28.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 5
28.02.2014 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
09.10.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
01.10.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.10.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
01.10.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.09.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.07.2013 Annex Search / examination 2
19.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.07.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
12.07.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.07.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
08.03.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.12.2010 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 5
28.06.2010 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
15.06.2010 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
02.06.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.05.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.05.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.05.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 4
11.05.2010 European search report Search / examination 4
02.02.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
18.01.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.01.2010 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 5
18.01.2010 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
18.01.2010 Priority document Search / examination 60
18.01.2010 Priority document Search / examination 56
12.01.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.12.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.12.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
18.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
18.12.2009 Description Search / examination 53
18.12.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.12.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4