Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2234069

EP2234069 - Method for generating shadows in an image [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2011  [2011/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2010/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Gautron, Pascal
c/o Thomson Licensing 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR
02 / Marvie, Jean-Eudes
c/o Thomson Licensing 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR
03 / Briand, Gérard
c/o Thomson Licensing 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR
 [2010/39]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/39]Huchet, Anne
Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Former [2010/39]Huchet, Anne
Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date09364002.727.03.2009
[2010/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2234069
Date:29.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/60
[2010/39]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2011/22]
Former [2010/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines Schattens in einem Bild[2010/39]
English:Method for generating shadows in an image[2010/39]
French:Procédé de génération d'ombre dans une image[2010/39]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/41]
12.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2011/41]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5742749  (FORAN JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * abstract * * figure 6a * * page 17, column 9 - page 18, column 12 * * page 17, column 10, line 16 - page 17, column 10, line 55 * * page 17, column 10, line 1 - line 15 * * page 13, column 1, line 48 - line 60 * * page 13, column 1, line 43 - line 44 * * page 17, column 10, line 33 - line 40 * * page 17, column 10, line 59 * * page 17, column 10, line 16 - line 29 *;
 [X]US7119806  (DONOVAN WALTER E [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6 * abstract * * figures 1-3B * * page 15, column 2, line 7 - page 16, column 3, line 37 * * column 3, equation A *;
 [X]  - SCHÜLER ET AL, "Eliminating Surface Acne with Gradient Shadow Mapping", SHADERX4. ADVANCED RENDERING TECHNIQUES, CHARLES RIVER MEDIA, INC, HINGHAM, MASSACHUSETTS, (20060112), ISBN 978-1-58450-425-2, pages 289 - 297, XP009120714 [X] 1,4-6 * figures 4.2.2,4.2.4,4.2.5 * * page 289, paragraph 2 * * pages 291-293 section "Depth Gradient" *
 [A]  - FOLEY C ET AL, "Computer graphics: principles and practice second edition (pages 721-731)", COMPUTER GRAPHICS: PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE, XX, XX, (19960101), pages 721 - 731, XP008107775 [A] 1-6 * figure 16.1 * * page 724, equation 16.4 * * pages 723-272, section 16.1.2 *
by applicantUS5870097