Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2301860

EP2301860 - Pallet container for liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2013
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Greif International Holding B.V.
Bergseweg 6
3633 AK Vreeland / NL
[2012/41]
Former [2011/13]For all designated states
Daviplast - Serviços de Consultoria, Sociedade Unipessoal LDA.
Avenida Do Infante 50
9000 Funchal, Madeira / PT
Inventor(s)01 / Cassina, Virginio
Via Turati, 8D
24020 Gorle (BG) / IT
 [2013/11]
Former [2011/13]01 / Cassina, Virginio
Via Turati 8D
24020 Gorle (BG) / IT
Representative(s)Perani & Partners S.p.A.
Piazza Armando Diaz, 7
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2011/13]Perani, Aurelio , et al
Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date09398009.229.09.2009
[2011/13]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2301860
Date:30.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2301860
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:B65D77/04
[2011/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/13]
TitleGerman:Palettenbehälter für Flüssigkeiten[2011/13]
English:Pallet container for liquids[2011/13]
French:Conteneur palette pour liquides[2011/13]
Examination procedure17.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/25]
10.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2013Fee for grant paid
19.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13164455.1  / EP2617660
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.06.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.02.2014   
Mauser-Werke GmbH
Schildgesstr. 71-163
D-50321 Brühl / DE
Opponent's representative
Tilmann, Max Wilhelm, et al
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Mönchenwerther Straße 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2014/15]
07.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.12.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition04.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0243/16
11.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
07.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
09.02.2012Request for further processing filed
09.02.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.02.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.09.2009
AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MK29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
SM29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IE29.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
LU29.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
MK29.05.2013
MT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
SM29.05.2013
TR29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IE29.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2015/30]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
SM29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IE29.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2015/24]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
SM29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IE29.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/34]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IE29.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/33]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IE29.09.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT29.05.2013
BE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
LV29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
HR29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
PL29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
SE29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT29.05.2013
NO29.08.2013
PT30.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2004096660  (MAUSER WERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,11-12 * page 9, paragraph 4 * * page 11; claims 1,2,9-12 * * figures 1-20 * [Y] 8-10,13-15;
 [YD]EP0755863  (FUSTIPLAST SPA [IT]) [YD] 8-10,13 * column 3, line 19 - line 32 * * figures 1-6; claim 1 *;
 [YD]EP1289852  (MAUSER WERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 14-15 * column 8, line 18; figures 17,18 *
ExaminationUS2006288620
by applicantEP1289852
 US5678688
 EP0755863