blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2221734 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2221734



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1009
04.10.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
07.12.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.11.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.10.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.10.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
17.10.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
10.07.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.07.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.07.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
10.07.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 226
10.07.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 226
16.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
16.05.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
05.05.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
05.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
05.05.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.05.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
05.05.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
16.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
16.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
16.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
16.03.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 26
05.12.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
01.12.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
01.12.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
30.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.11.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Annex Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Search / examination 2
09.11.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
08.11.2016 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
08.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
08.11.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Refund of fees Appeal 1
04.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.09.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 10
29.09.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 10
29.09.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
29.09.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.09.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.08.2016 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 2
14.07.2016 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
04.05.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
20.04.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
04.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
04.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
04.04.2016 Amended description with annotations Appeal 5
04.04.2016 Claims Appeal 4
04.04.2016 Claims Appeal 3
04.04.2016 Claims Appeal 3
04.04.2016 Description Appeal 5
04.04.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 25
12.01.2016 Claims Appeal 4
12.01.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.01.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
23.12.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
21.12.2015 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Means of redress Search / examination 2
03.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.06.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
30.06.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.05.2014 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
04.02.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
13.12.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.09.2013 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
11.01.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
11.01.2012 Claims Search / examination 4
11.01.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
13.07.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.07.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.03.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
04.03.2011 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 18
24.02.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.02.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
24.02.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.02.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
24.02.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.08.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
28.07.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.09.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 3
04.09.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
06.08.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.08.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
30.07.2009 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.07.2009 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
12.05.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of filing/search fee) Search / examination 3
16.02.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.02.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
16.02.2009 Description Search / examination 197
16.02.2009 Drawings Search / examination 28
16.02.2009 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8