Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2249313

EP2249313 - Method for use-specific initialisation of vehicle devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.10.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kapsch TrafficCom AG
Am Europlatz 2
1120 Wien / AT
[2010/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Nagy, Oliver
Leopold Steiner Gasse 48
1190 Wien / AT
 [2010/45]
Representative(s)Weiser, Andreas
Patentanwalt Kopfgasse 7
1130 Wien / AT
[2011/47]
Former [2010/45]Weiser, Andreas
Patentanwalt Kopfgasse 7
1130 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date09450094.905.05.2009
[2010/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2249313
Date:10.11.2010
Language:DE
[2010/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2249313
Date:23.11.2011
Language:DE
[2011/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:G07B15/00, B60R25/00
[2010/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/45]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur nutzungsspezifischen Initialisierung von Fahrzeuggeräten[2010/45]
English:Method for use-specific initialisation of vehicle devices[2010/45]
French:Procédé d'initialisation spécifique à l'utilisation d'appareils de véhicules[2010/45]
Examination procedure09.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/16]
09.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2011Fee for grant paid
11.10.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.08.2012  31.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Toll Collect GmbH
Linkstrasse 4
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner, et al
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
 [2015/38]
Former [2012/40]
Opponent(s)01  23.08.2012   
Toll Collect GmbH
Linkstrasse 4
10785 Berlin / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
04.10.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.01.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.12.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition15.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0337/16
25.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
CZ05.05.2017
GB05.05.2017
IT05.05.2017
PL05.05.2017
SK05.05.2017
HU06.05.2017
SI06.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT06.11.2017
AT05.05.2018
ES06.05.2018
SE06.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
DE01.12.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2019/23]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
CZ05.05.2017
GB05.05.2017
IT05.05.2017
PL05.05.2017
SK05.05.2017
HU06.05.2017
SI06.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT06.11.2017
AT05.05.2018
SE06.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
DE01.12.2018
Former [2019/21]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
CZ05.05.2017
GB05.05.2017
IT05.05.2017
PL05.05.2017
SK05.05.2017
HU06.05.2017
SI06.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT06.11.2017
AT05.05.2018
SE06.05.2018
DE01.12.2018
Former [2019/10]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
CZ05.05.2017
GB05.05.2017
IT05.05.2017
PL05.05.2017
SK05.05.2017
HU06.05.2017
SI06.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT06.11.2017
AT05.05.2018
SE06.05.2018
Former [2018/50]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
CZ05.05.2017
GB05.05.2017
IT05.05.2017
PL05.05.2017
SK05.05.2017
HU06.05.2017
SI06.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT06.11.2017
Former [2018/39]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
CZ05.05.2017
GB05.05.2017
IT05.05.2017
SK05.05.2017
HU06.05.2017
SI06.05.2017
BE31.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT06.11.2017
Former [2018/28]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
CZ05.05.2017
GB05.05.2017
IT05.05.2017
SK05.05.2017
HU06.05.2017
SI06.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT06.11.2017
Former [2018/21]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
CZ05.05.2017
GB05.05.2017
SK05.05.2017
HU06.05.2017
SI06.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT06.11.2017
Former [2018/15]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
CZ05.05.2017
SK05.05.2017
HU06.05.2017
SI06.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
NL01.06.2017
PT06.11.2017
Former [2018/13]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
CZ05.05.2017
SK05.05.2017
HU06.05.2017
SI06.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
PT06.11.2017
Former [2018/11]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
CZ05.05.2017
SK05.05.2017
HU06.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
Former [2018/10]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
CZ05.05.2017
SK05.05.2017
HU06.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
Former [2018/09]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
HU06.05.2017
NO31.05.2017
Former [2018/07]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
NO31.05.2017
Former [2014/27]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
LU05.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2014/21]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
TR23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/35]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
MT23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/29]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
FI23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
MK23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2012/36]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
RO23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
Former [2012/35]CY23.11.2011
DK23.11.2011
EE23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
IE23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
BG23.02.2012
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
Former [2012/28]CY23.11.2011
HR23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
Former [2012/27]HR23.11.2011
LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT23.11.2011
LV23.11.2011
GR24.02.2012
IS23.03.2012
Former [2012/21]LT23.11.2011
IS23.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT23.11.2011
Documents cited:Search[IY]EP1870302  (AGES INTERNAT GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1-3,5-11,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0067] * [Y] 4,12;
 [YA]WO2006050543  (KAPSCH TRAFFICCOM AG [AT], et al) [Y] 4,12 * abstract * * page 5, line 20 - page 7, line 12 * [A] 1-3,5-11,13-15