Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2325807

EP2325807 - Method and device for generating toll information in a road toll system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.01.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kapsch TrafficCom AG
Am Europlatz 2
1120 Wien / AT
[2011/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Van Haperen, Peter
Stuifenstrasse 4
71576 Burgstetten / DE
02 / Kersten, Jan
Birkfeldstr. 9/1
71570 Oppenweiler / DE
03 / Tijink, Jasja
Ketzergasse 191/1/14
2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT
 [2011/21]
Representative(s)Weiser & Voith Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Kopfgasse 7
1130 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2012/08]Weiser, Andreas
Patentanwalt Kopfgasse 7
1130 Wien / AT
Former [2011/21]Weiser, Andreas
Patentanwalt Kopfgasse 7
1130 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date09450219.223.11.2009
[2011/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2325807
Date:25.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2325807
Date:22.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:G07B15/06
[2011/33]
Former International [2011/21]G07B15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/21]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zum Erzeugen von Mautinformationen in einem Strassenmautsystem[2011/21]
English:Method and device for generating toll information in a road toll system[2011/21]
French:Procédé et dispositifs de production d'informations de péage dans un système de péage routier[2011/21]
Examination procedure17.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/21]
16.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2011Fee for grant paid
07.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11008288.0  / EP2407935
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.05.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.11.2012  18.12.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Toll Collect GmbH
Linkstrasse 4
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner, et al
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
 [2015/38]
Former [2013/02]
Opponent(s)01  22.11.2012   
Toll Collect GmbH
Linkstrasse 4
10785 Berlin / DE
16.01.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.05.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition15.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0335/16
25.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
MK22.02.2012
MT22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SM22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
LU23.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
CZ23.11.2017
GB23.11.2017
IT23.11.2017
PL23.11.2017
SK23.11.2017
HU24.11.2017
SI24.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
DK30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
NL01.12.2017
PT23.05.2018
[2019/22]
Former [2018/51]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
MK22.02.2012
MT22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SM22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
LU23.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
CZ23.11.2017
GB23.11.2017
IT23.11.2017
SK23.11.2017
HU24.11.2017
SI24.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
DK30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
NL01.12.2017
PT23.05.2018
Former [2018/50]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
MK22.02.2012
MT22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SM22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
LU23.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
CZ23.11.2017
GB23.11.2017
IT23.11.2017
SK23.11.2017
HU24.11.2017
SI24.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
NL01.12.2017
PT23.05.2018
Former [2018/47]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
MK22.02.2012
MT22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SM22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
LU23.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
CZ23.11.2017
IT23.11.2017
SK23.11.2017
HU24.11.2017
SI24.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
NL01.12.2017
PT23.05.2018
Former [2018/45]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
MK22.02.2012
MT22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SM22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
LU23.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
CZ23.11.2017
SK23.11.2017
HU24.11.2017
SI24.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
NL01.12.2017
PT23.05.2018
Former [2018/40]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
MK22.02.2012
MT22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SM22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
LU23.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
CZ23.11.2017
SK23.11.2017
HU24.11.2017
SI24.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
PT23.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
MK22.02.2012
MT22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SM22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
LU23.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
CZ23.11.2017
SK23.11.2017
SI24.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
PT23.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
MK22.02.2012
MT22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SM22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
LU23.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
CZ23.11.2017
SK23.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
PT23.05.2018
Former [2015/32]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
MK22.02.2012
MT22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SM22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
LU23.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
Former [2014/27]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
MT22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
SM22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
LU23.11.2012
MC30.11.2012
Former [2014/21]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
MT22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
TR22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
MC30.11.2012
Former [2013/51]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
MT22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
Former [2013/33]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
BG22.05.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
Former [2012/49]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
RO22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
Former [2012/48]CY22.02.2012
EE22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
Former [2012/47]CY22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
IE22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY22.02.2012
FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
Former [2012/39]FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
LV22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI22.02.2012
HR22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
Former [2012/36]HR22.02.2012
LT22.02.2012
GR23.05.2012
IS22.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT22.02.2012
IS22.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1909231  (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0201] - paragraph [0213] * * paragraph [0226] - paragraph [0235] * * paragraph [0303] - paragraph [0307] *;
 [Y]EP0802509  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 8 *;
 [A]WO9210824  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 2,13 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph l * * page 8, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]DE10104499  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0058] *