Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2232455

EP2232455 - MONITORING DEVICE FOR AN ALARM SYSTEM, ALARM SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR MONITORING SAID ALARM SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.03.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2010/39]
Inventor(s)01 / GUERTNER, Michael
Goerresstr.27
80798 Muenchen / DE
02 / SCHMIDL, Joachim
Massliebchenstr. 18
80935 Muenchen / DE
03 / PREISINGER, Marcus
Rathausplatz 4
82008 Unterhaching / DE
 [2010/39]
Application number, filing date09700171.307.01.2009
[2010/39]
WO2009EP50125
Priority number, dateDE2008100379910.01.2008         Original published format: DE102008003799
[2010/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009087169
Date:16.07.2009
Language:DE
[2009/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2232455
Date:29.09.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009
[2010/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2232455
Date:24.04.2013
Language:DE
[2013/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:G08B25/06, G08B29/06, G08B29/08, G01R31/02
[2010/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/39]
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN MELDESYSTEM, MELDESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES MELDESYSTEMS[2010/39]
English:MONITORING DEVICE FOR AN ALARM SYSTEM, ALARM SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR MONITORING SAID ALARM SYSTEM[2010/39]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE POUR UN SYSTÈME D'ALARME, SYSTÈME D'ALARME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DU SYSTÈME D'ALARME[2010/39]
Entry into regional phase10.08.2010National basic fee paid 
10.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
10.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
03.09.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2013Fee for grant paid
15.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.01.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.01.2014   
Novar GmbH
Dieselstrasse 2
41469 Neuss / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/10]
Opponent(s)01  24.01.2014   
Novar GmbH
Dieselstrasse 2
41469 Neuss / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
28.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.10.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.11.2015Appeal received No.  T2158/15
27.01.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.01.2009
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MK24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
AT07.01.2014
GB07.01.2014
IE07.01.2014
LU07.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU07.01.2009
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
AT07.01.2014
GB07.01.2014
IE07.01.2014
LU07.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2016/32]HU07.01.2009
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
AT07.01.2014
GB07.01.2014
IE07.01.2014
LU07.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2016/12]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
AT07.01.2014
GB07.01.2014
IE07.01.2014
LU07.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2015/25]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
AT07.01.2014
GB07.01.2014
IE07.01.2014
LU07.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2015/08]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
GB07.01.2014
IE07.01.2014
LU07.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2015/07]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
GB07.01.2014
IE07.01.2014
LU07.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/51]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
GB07.01.2014
LU07.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/46]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
LU07.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/41]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
LU07.01.2014
Former [2014/38]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/14]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/11]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/10]CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/09]CY24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/52]CY24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/51]FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/50]FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/49]FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/48]LT24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
PT26.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1197936  (JOB LIZENZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0032] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO7900844  (SAAB SCANIA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 17 * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 22 * * page 7, line 3 - line 5 * * page 8, line 20 - line 22 * * page 9, line 9 - line 13 * * figure 1 *