Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2242863 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2242863



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2949
24.01.2020 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 5
23.01.2020 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
22.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.01.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure Appeal 1
08.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.01.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure Appeal 1
07.11.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.10.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
28.10.2019 Fax relating to review procedure Appeal 1
23.10.2019 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure Appeal 2
23.10.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 13
23.10.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
15.10.2019 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
28.06.2019 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
28.06.2019 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
07.06.2019 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
07.06.2019 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 4
17.05.2019 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
19.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.04.2019 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 9
13.03.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
05.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.02.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.02.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.02.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
18.02.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.02.2019 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.02.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
15.02.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 2
13.02.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.02.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 31
12.02.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 31
12.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 5
12.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
19.11.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.11.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.11.2018 Claims Appeal 2
19.11.2018 Claims Appeal 2
19.11.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
19.11.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
19.11.2018 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 5
19.11.2018 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 5
06.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 8
06.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 8
05.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.11.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.11.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.11.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
10.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
08.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
04.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.10.2018 Authorisation Appeal 1
04.10.2018 Authorisation Appeal 1
04.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
02.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
01.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.09.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
27.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.09.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
24.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.09.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
24.09.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 2
24.09.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
21.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.09.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.09.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 5
17.09.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 5
13.09.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
10.09.2018 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
07.09.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
29.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
24.08.2018 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 4
23.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
23.08.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
20.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
20.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
20.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
20.08.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.08.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.08.2018 Claims Appeal 2
20.08.2018 Claims Appeal 1
20.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.08.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
20.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
20.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
20.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
20.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
20.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
20.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
20.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.08.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.08.2018 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
20.08.2018 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
18.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
12.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.07.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
11.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.07.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
10.07.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
10.07.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
06.07.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
05.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.07.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
03.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 10
03.07.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 10
28.06.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
22.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
20.12.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
19.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
19.12.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
19.12.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.12.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
18.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.12.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 29
18.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
18.12.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 27
18.12.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
12.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
12.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
07.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.12.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 37
06.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.12.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 41
09.08.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
09.08.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.08.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.08.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.08.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
04.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
04.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
04.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
04.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
04.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
04.08.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.08.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.08.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.08.2017 Claims Appeal 3
04.08.2017 Claims Appeal 3
04.08.2017 Claims Appeal 3
04.08.2017 Claims Appeal 3
04.08.2017 Claims Appeal 3
04.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.08.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.08.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
04.08.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 81
04.08.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
13.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 5
10.07.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
07.07.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.06.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.06.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
27.06.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
27.06.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 17
27.06.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 2
27.06.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.03.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.03.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
23.03.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
23.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
20.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.03.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 1
23.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.02.2017 Authorisation Opposition 1
13.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
13.02.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.01.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.01.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.11.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 21
18.11.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.11.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
03.11.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
31.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
26.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.10.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.10.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.10.2016 Authorisation Opposition 1
21.10.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.10.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.10.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 15
20.10.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
20.10.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
20.10.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
20.10.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.10.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
02.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
26.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
25.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
23.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
23.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
23.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
23.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
23.08.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
23.08.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
23.08.2016 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 76
23.08.2016 Claims Opposition 3
23.08.2016 Claims Opposition 3
23.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
23.08.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
23.08.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
23.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
07.07.2016 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
24.05.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.04.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 20
06.04.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.04.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.04.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
15.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 46
22.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.12.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
26.08.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
10.08.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
05.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.05.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 27
01.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.04.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
01.04.2015 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
01.04.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
31.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
31.03.2015 Authorisation Opposition 1
31.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
31.03.2015 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
16.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.03.2015 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
09.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
09.03.2015 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
03.03.2015 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
09.02.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 4
05.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
20.01.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
19.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
19.01.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
19.12.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.11.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
13.11.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
11.11.2014 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Opposition 1
04.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.11.2014 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
17.10.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.10.2014 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.10.2014 Annex Opposition 4
13.10.2014 Annex Opposition 2
13.10.2014 Annex Opposition 4
13.10.2014 Annex Opposition 12
13.10.2014 Annex Opposition 4
13.10.2014 Annex Opposition 2
13.10.2014 Annex Opposition 4
13.10.2014 Annex Opposition 2
13.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
13.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
13.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
13.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.10.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 15
13.10.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
13.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
13.10.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
07.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.10.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
07.10.2014 Authorisation Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.10.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 190
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 192
07.10.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 6
07.10.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 80
07.10.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 3
07.10.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 84
07.10.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 84
07.10.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 14
07.10.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
07.10.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
07.10.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
07.10.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
07.10.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
07.10.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 27
07.10.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 30
07.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
07.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
07.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
07.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
07.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.10.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
07.10.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
12.02.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.01.2014 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
12.12.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.11.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.11.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
26.11.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
26.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.10.2013 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
30.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
10.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.10.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
02.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.08.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
30.07.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.07.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.07.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.07.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
29.07.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
15.10.2010 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
29.09.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.09.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
08.09.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
08.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.09.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
27.08.2010 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
22.07.2010 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
22.07.2010 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
24.06.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
28.05.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
26.04.2010 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
26.04.2010 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.04.2010 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.04.2010 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.04.2010 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.04.2010 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.04.2010 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.04.2010 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.04.2010 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.04.2010 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
08.04.2010 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
08.04.2010 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.03.2010 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.03.2010 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.03.2010 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
24.11.2009 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.11.2009 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.11.2009 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.11.2009 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.11.2009 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
16.11.2009 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
16.11.2009 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
10.11.2009 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
10.11.2009 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
10.11.2009 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
10.11.2009 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
24.08.2009 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 3
11.08.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
06.08.2009 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
23.07.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
23.07.2009 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 24
16.04.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
16.04.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
16.04.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 4
17.03.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
17.03.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 4
17.03.2009 Description International Searching Authority 18
17.03.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 1