Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2243054

EP2243054 - SUBSTRATE LAMINATION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2014
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.12.2014  [2014/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rockwell Collins, Inc.
400 Collins Road NE M/S 124-323
Cedar Rapids, IA 52498 / US
[2010/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BARNIDGE, Tracy, J.
4255 Windemere Way
Marion Iowa 52302 / US
02 / NEMETH, Paul, R.
2066 Blue Heron Drive
Springfield, Iowa 52403 / US
03 / SAMPICA, James, D.
136 Circle Drive
Springville Iowa 52336 / US
04 / MARZEN, Vincent, P.
410 Evergreen Lane
Robins Iowa 52328 / US
05 / TCHON, Joseph, L.
7505 Princeton Dr.
Cedar Rapids Iowa 52402 / US
 [2011/03]
Former [2010/48]01 / BARNIDGE, Tracy, J.
4255 Windemere Way
Marion Iowa 52302 / US
02 / NEMETH, Paul, R.
2066 Blue Heron Drive
Springfield Iowa 52403 Iowa 52403 / US
03 / SAMPICA, James, D.
136 Circle Drive
Springville Iowa 52336 / US
04 / MARZEN, Vincent, P.
410 Evergreen Lane
Robins Iowa 52328 / US
05 / TCHON, Joseph, L.
7505 Princeton Dr.
Cedar Rapids Iowa 52402 / US
Former [2010/43]01 / BARNIDGE, Tracy, J.
4255 Windemere Way
Marion Iowa 52302 / US
02 / NEMETH, Paul, R.
862 Augusta Drive
Cedar Rapids Iowa 52403 / US
03 / SAMPICA, James, D.
136 Circle Drive
Springville Iowa 52336 / US
04 / MARZEN, Vincent, P.
410 Evergreen Lane
Robins Iowa 52328 / US
05 / TCHON, Joseph, L.
7505 Princeton Dr.
Cedar Rapids Iowa 52402 / US
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/43]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date09702309.715.01.2009
[2010/43]
WO2009US31151
Priority number, dateUS2008000937518.01.2008         Original published format: US 9375
US2008000947218.01.2008         Original published format: US 9472
US2008000937318.01.2008         Original published format: US 9373
US2008000939318.01.2008         Original published format: US 9393
US2008000937218.01.2008         Original published format: US 9372
US2008000948218.01.2008         Original published format: US 9482
[2010/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009091923
Date:23.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2243054
Date:27.10.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009
[2010/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.10.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/13, H05B33/10, H01L51/50, B32B7/06
[2010/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/43]
TitleGerman:SUBSTRATLAMINATIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2010/43]
English:SUBSTRATE LAMINATION SYSTEM AND METHOD[2010/43]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE STRATIFICATION DE SUBSTRAT[2010/43]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2010National basic fee paid 
30.07.2010Search fee paid 
30.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/43]
23.09.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/51]
06.05.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/51]
Divisional application(s)EP14161363.8  / EP2749412
EP16188276.6  / EP3135490
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201103   M06   Fee paid on   21.04.2011
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5592288  (SAMPICA JAMES D [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 37 - line 49 * * column 6, line 31 - line 33 * * column 6, line 46 - line 51 * * figures 1,7 * [I] 2
International search[X]JP2006222267  (NITTO DENKO CORP);
 [A]KR19990029922  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]JP2001005401  (HITACHI TECHNO ENG);
 [A]KR20070016614  (SAMSUNG ELECTONICS CO., LTD);
 [A]JP2002137352  (IBM)