EP2236281 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING GLASS/RESIN COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Opposition rejected | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Inc. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2018/39] |
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Satoshi c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1, Yurakucho1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2012/33] |
Former [2010/40] | 01 /
KONDO, Satoshi c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1, Yurakucho1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09703567.9 | 14.01.2009 | [2010/40] | WO2009JP50384 | Priority number, date | JP20080014430 | 25.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008014430 | [2010/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009093505 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236281 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2236281 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, B29C47/06, C03B17/06 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
B32B17/10 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/0021 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/154 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/16 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/18 (KR);
B29C48/21 (EP,KR,US);
B29C65/48 (KR,US);
B32B37/206 (EP,KR,US);
B32B38/105 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/06 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/12 (KR);
C03C17/002 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/32 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/40] | B32B17/10, B29C47/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GLAS/HARZ-VERBUNDES | [2010/40] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING GLASS/RESIN COMPOSITE | [2010/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSITE VERRE/RÉSINE | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2010 | Translation filed | 15.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 22.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.05.2013
23.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang Dreiköniggasse 10 89073 Ulm / DE | [2013/31] |
Former [2013/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.05.2013
Schott AG / Schott Solar Thin Film GmbH Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE Opponent's representative Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang Dreiköniggasse 10 89073 Ulm / DE | 19.06.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.12.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 16.01.2020 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2020/14] | Appeal following opposition | 22.12.2015 | Appeal received No. T2367/15 | 10.03.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.01.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 16.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.01.2020 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2009 | AT | 15.08.2012 | BE | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | HR | 15.08.2012 | IT | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | MK | 15.08.2012 | MT | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | NO | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | ES | 26.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | IE | 14.01.2013 | LU | 14.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MK | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE10040640 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 53; figure 1; claims 1,13,23 * * column 5, line 21 - line 35 *; | [A]US2002136907 (WEBER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6502423 (OSTENDARP HEINRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 8 - line 28; claims 1,12 *; | [Y]US6815070 (BUERKLE ROLAND [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * column 10, line 27 - line 48; figure 2; claims 15-19 * * column 11, line 7 - line 28 * | International search | [Y]JPS63233022 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC); | [A]JPH06206246 (BEKAERT SA NV); | [A]JPH06340029 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JP2001097733 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND); | [Y]JP2002534305 (SCHOTT DISPLAY GLAS GMBH); | [Y]JP2002542971 (SCHOTT DISPLAY GLAS GMBH); | [A]JP2005014563 (NIPPON ZEON CO); | [Y]JP2007010834 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) | by applicant | JP2001097733 | JP2001113631 | JP2002534305 | JP2007010834 |