Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2250362

EP2250362 - CAMSHAFT MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.11.2013
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ThyssenKrupp Presta TecCenter AG
Essanestrasse 10
9492 Eschen / LI
For all designated states
POLYTEC PLASTICS Germany GmbH & Co. KG
Brandstrasse 29
49393 Lohne / DE
[2012/50]
Former [2010/46]For all designated states
ThyssenKrupp Presta TecCenter AG
Essanestrasse 10
9492 Eschen / LI
For all designated states
Polytec Automotive GmbH & Co. KG
Meyerfelder Weg 45
49393 Lohne / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ILGEROTH, Mario
Steigerweg 11a
06502 Thale / DE
02 / FREYTAG, Andreas
Neudorf 22
06484 Quedlinburg / DE
03 / LANGER, Alexander
Weststr. 45
09112 Chemnitz / DE
04 / WAGNER, Henrik
Am Grossen Garten 3
38871 Ilsenburg / DE
05 / RETZLAFF, Stefan
Unterm Ratskopf 39
38855 Wernigerode / DE
06 / SOARES, Jorge, Manuel, Miranda
Ketteler Str. 70
48493 Wettringen / DE
07 / SCHULING, Norbert
Wangeroogerstr. 101
49393 Lohne / DE
08 / JANSSEN, Hans
Hermannstrasse 22
49413 Dinklage / DE
 [2010/47]
Former [2010/46]01 / ILGEROTH, Mario
Steigerweg 11a
06502 Thale / DE
02 / FREYTAG, Andreas
Neudorf 22
06484 Quedlinburg / DE
03 / LANGER, Alexander
Am Sonnenbrink 33
38855 Wernigerode / DE
04 / WAGNER, Henrik
Am Grossen Garten 3
38871 Ilsenburg / DE
05 / RETZLAFF, Stefan
Unterm Ratskopf 39
38855 Wernigerode / DE
06 / SOARES, Jorge, Manuel, Miranda
Ketteler Str. 70
48493 Wettringen / DE
07 / SCHULING, Norbert
Wangeroogerstr. 101
49393 Lohne / DE
08 / JANSSEN, Hans
Hermannstrasse 22
49413 Dinklage / DE
Representative(s)Adams, Steffen
ThyssenKrupp AG
Corporate Center Legal & Compliance/Patents
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
[2012/45]
Former [2010/46]Adams, Steffen
ThyssenKrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Former [2010/46]Adams, Steffen
ThyssenKrupp Technologies AG Legal and Compliance, Patents Am Thyssenhaus 1
45128 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date09705666.728.01.2009
[2010/46]
WO2009EP00533
Priority number, dateDE2008100709131.01.2008         Original published format: DE102008007091
[2010/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009095215
Date:06.08.2009
Language:DE
[2009/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2250362
Date:17.11.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009
[2010/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2250362
Date:26.12.2012
Language:DE
[2012/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:F02F7/00, F01L1/053
[2010/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/46]
TitleGerman:NOCKENWELLENMODUL[2010/46]
English:CAMSHAFT MODULE[2010/46]
French:MODULE D'ARBRE À CAME[2010/46]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2010National basic fee paid 
31.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/46]
19.10.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2012Fee for grant paid
10.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2012
Opposition(s)27.09.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.01.2009
CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
DK26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
IT26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
MK26.12.2012
MT26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
TR26.12.2012
IE28.01.2013
LU28.01.2013
BE31.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
DK26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
IT26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
MK26.12.2012
MT26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
TR26.12.2012
IE28.01.2013
BE31.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2014/32]CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
DK26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
IT26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
MT26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
IE28.01.2013
BE31.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2014/07]CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
DK26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
IT26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
IE28.01.2013
BE31.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2014/03]CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
DK26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
IT26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BE31.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2013/52]CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
DK26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BE31.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2013/49]CZ26.12.2012
DK26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BE31.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2013/48]CZ26.12.2012
DK26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2013/40]CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
MC31.01.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2013/37]CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
NL26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
MC31.01.2013
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
Former [2013/36]CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
Former [2013/35]CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
Former [2013/34]FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
Former [2013/26]FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
Former [2013/24]FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
NO26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
Former [2013/23]FI26.12.2012
HR26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
NO26.03.2013
Former [2013/22]FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
NO26.03.2013
Former [2013/21]LT26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
NO26.03.2013
Former [2013/20]LT26.12.2012
NO26.03.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19603692  (MBI MASCHINEN UND BAUINGENIEUR [DE]) [X] 1-3,8 * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE19831772  (BATTLOGG STEFAN [AT]) [X] 1,2,9,10,14-17 * figures 2,3 *;
 [PX]EP1998034  (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1 * figures 3,5,6 *;
 [A]DE3643673  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * figure 4 *;
 [A]DE3641129  (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 55-65; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE4017048  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US3352293  (HULTEN RICHARD E) [A] 1 * figures 2-5 *;
 [DA]DE20120912U  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [DA] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE202006018359U  (THYSSENKRUPP PRESTA AG [LI]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3672338  (YAMANOUCHI YUICHI) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *
by applicantDE20120912U
 DE19603692
 DE19831772