Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2257250

EP2257250 - DRUG DELIVERY DEVICES, KITS AND METHODS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.12.2015
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.01.2016  [2016/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kliman, Gilbert H.
128 Goya Road
Portola Valley, CA 94028-7307 / US
[2010/49]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2010/49]
Representative(s)Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG
Biberstrasse 22
Postfach 36
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2011/51]Forsthuber, Martin , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG Siebensterngasse 54
1071 Wien / AT
Former [2010/49]Millburn, Julie Elizabeth
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London
WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date09706663.329.01.2009
[2010/49]
WO2009US32500
Priority number, dateUS2008002446229.01.2008         Original published format: US 24462
[2010/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009097468
Date:06.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2257250
Date:08.12.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009
[2010/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/00
[2010/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/49]
TitleGerman:ARZNEIMITTELSPENDEVORRICHTUNGEN, KITS UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2010/49]
English:DRUG DELIVERY DEVICES, KITS AND METHODS THEREFOR[2010/49]
French:DISPOSITIFS, TROUSSES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS[2010/49]
Entry into regional phase25.08.2010National basic fee paid 
25.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/49]
16.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/01]
31.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
16.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201507   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XAY]WO2007083293  (NULENS LTD [IL]; BEN NUN JOSHUA [IL]) [X] 1,7-11,20-22,25-27,30-34,51,53,61-63 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 12 * * page 2, line 27 - page 4, line 25; figure -; claim 1 * [A] 2-5,12,13,18,52,54 [Y] 23,24,35-37,39-42,46-50,55;
 [XAY]WO02055058  (MICROCHIPS INC [US]) [X] 1,7-13,18,20,21,23,25,28-34,51,53,55,61-63 * page 2, line 15 - page 4, line 10 * * page 11, line 31 - page 13, line 14; figure -; claims 1,2,6,8,10,16,38,40 * [A] 22,35,56 [Y] 2-6;
 [YA]WO2007084765  (POTENTIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]; DESCHATELETS PASCAL [US]; OLSON PAU) [Y] 35-37,39-42,46-50,55 * paragraphs [0075] , [0087] , [0092] , [0096] , [0104]; claims 8,10,36,39 * [A] 7,12,43-45,63;
 [YA]US2007026048  (GREENBERG ROBERT [US]) [Y] 23,24 * paragraphs [0071] , [0076] , [0077] , [0083] , [0084]; figures 9,11; claims 6,11,18,19 * [A] 1,7,10-12,25,30-47,56-61,63;
 [Y]  - HUTTMANN G ET AL, "New concepts in laser medicine: Towards a laser surgery with cellular precision", MEDICAL LASER APPLICATION, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 20, no. 2, ISSN 1615-1615, (20050608), pages 135 - 139, (20050608), XP025339440 [Y] 2-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mla.2005.03.010