Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2238470

EP2238470 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A DISTANCE TO AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Faro Technologies, Inc.
125 Technology Park
Lake Mary, FL 32746-6204 / US
[2010/41]
Inventor(s)01 / OSSIG, Martin
Wiesenstrasse 23
71732 Tamm / DE
02 / SCHUMANN, Philipp
Happoldstr.35b
70469 Stuttgart / DE
 [2010/46]
Former [2010/41]01 / OSSIG, Martin
Wiesenstrasse 23
71732 Tamm / DE
02 / SCHUMANN, Philipp
Feuerbacher-Tal-Str. 8
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Representative(s)Hosenthien-Held, Jutta
Patentanwälte
Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held
Klopstockstrasse 63-65
D-70193 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/41]Hosenthien-Held, Jutta
Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63-65
D-70193 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date09706836.527.01.2009
[2010/41]
WO2009EP50887
Priority number, dateDE2008100806401.02.2008         Original published format: DE102008008064
DE2008101427403.03.2008         Original published format: DE102008014274
[2010/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009095383
Date:06.08.2009
Language:DE
[2009/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2238470
Date:13.10.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009
[2010/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01S17/10, G01S17/36
[2010/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN EINER ENTFERNUNG ZU EINEM OBJEKT[2010/41]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A DISTANCE TO AN OBJECT[2010/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTERMINER UNE DISTANCE PAR RAPPORT À UN OBJET[2010/41]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2009National basic fee paid 
19.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/41]
08.07.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination31.03.2014Appeal received No.  T1015/14
31.03.2014Statement of grounds filed
03.06.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/23]
24.06.2019Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2019/26]
13.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.09.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
16.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19811550  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [XD]DE4027990  (MESSERSCHMITT-BOELKOW-BLOHM GMBH, 8012 OTTOBRUNN, DE) [XD] 1-6,9-12 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE10361870  (IQSUN GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,12 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19811550
 DE4027990
 DE10361870
 DE4303804