Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2239297

EP2239297 - CROSSLINKABLE NITRILE RUBBER COMPOSITION AND CROSSLINKED RUBBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zeon Corporation
6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8246 / JP
[2010/41]
Inventor(s)01 / IKEDA, Shinya
c/o Zeon Corporation
6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8246 / JP
02 / NAGAMORI, Hiroyasu
c/o Zeon Corporation
6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8246 / JP
03 / ABRAHAM, Peter J.
c/o ZEON Chemicals Europe Ltd.
Sully Vale of Glamorgan CF64 5ZE / GB
 [2018/52]
Former [2010/41]01 / IKEDA, Shinya
c/o Zeon Corporation 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8246 / JP
02 / NAGAMORI, Hiroyasu
c/o Zeon Corporation 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8246 / JP
03 / ABRAHAM, Peter J.
c/o ZEON Chemicals Europe Ltd.
Sully Vale of Glamorgan CF64 5ZE / GB
Representative(s)Beckmann, Claus , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2014/41]
Former [2014/38]Adam, Holger , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2010/41]Albrecht, Thomas
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date09707024.730.01.2009
[2010/41]
WO2009JP51570
Priority number, dateJP2008002069931.01.2008         Original published format: JP 2008020699
[2010/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009096518
Date:06.08.2009
Language:JA
[2009/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2239297
Date:13.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2239297
Date:26.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.08.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08L9/02, C08K5/17, C08K5/3442, C08F236/12, C08K5/18
[2018/33]
Former International [2017/20]C08L9/02, C08K5/17, C08K5/3442, C08F236/12
Former International [2010/41]C08L9/02, C08K5/17, C08K5/3442
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/52]
Former [2010/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERNETZBARE NITRILKAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERNETZTER KAUTSCHUK[2010/41]
English:CROSSLINKABLE NITRILE RUBBER COMPOSITION AND CROSSLINKED RUBBER[2010/41]
French:COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC DE NITRILE RÉTICULABLE ET CAOUTCHOUC RÉTICULÉ[2010/41]
Entry into regional phase07.06.2010Translation filed 
07.06.2010National basic fee paid 
07.06.2010Search fee paid 
07.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/41]
14.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2018Fee for grant paid
16.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2007072900  (ZEON CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * examples 2-1,2-2,4-1,4-2,4-3; claims 1-17; tables 2,4 * [Y] 5;
 [XP]EP1964882  (ZEON CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-4,6-10 * examples 2-1,2-2,4-1,4-2,4-3; claims 1-17; tables 2,4 *;
 [Y]EP1170331  (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0030]; example 7 *
International search[X]WO2007049651  (ZEON CORP [JP], et al);
 [A]JPH04338533  (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD);
 [A]JP2007261079  (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD);
 [A]JPH08296772  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER);
 [A]JP2001055471  (NIPPON ZEON CO)
by applicantJP2001055471