Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2250428

EP2250428 - LIGHTING MODULE, LAMP AND LIGHTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.10.2015
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OSRAM GmbH
Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
For all designated states
OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH
Leibnizstrasse 4
93055 Regensburg / DE
[2013/16]
Former [2013/08]For all designated states
OSRAM GmbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
For all designated states
OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH
Leibnizstrasse 4
93055 Regensburg / DE
Former [2012/29]For all designated states
OSRAM AG
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81536 München / DE
For all designated states
OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH
Leibnizstrasse 4
93055 Regensburg / DE
Former [2010/46]For all designated states
Osram Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
For all designated states
OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH
Leibnizstrasse 4
93055 Regensburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PAHLKE, Monika
Toni-Schmid-Str. 28
81825 München / DE
02 / SCHROLL, Katrin
Reichlberg 1
83301 Matzing / DE
03 / BILLY, Hartmut
Am Olivberg 1
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
04 / MUSCHAWECK, Julius Augustin
Zugspitzstr. 66
82131 Gauting / DE
 [2010/46]
Representative(s)Schulze, Mark
Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze
Patentanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 12A
81675 München / DE
[2014/48]
Former [2010/46]Schulze, Mark
Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 12A
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date09708178.006.02.2009
[2010/46]
WO2009EP00849
Priority number, dateDE2008100772306.02.2008         Original published format: DE102008007723
[2010/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009098081
Date:13.08.2009
Language:DE
[2009/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2250428
Date:17.11.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009
[2010/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2250428
Date:26.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:F21K99/00, F21V13/04, F21S8/00
[2010/47]
Former International [2010/46]F21K7/00, F21V13/04, F21S8/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/46]
TitleGerman:BELEUCHTUNGSMODUL, LEUCHTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BELEUCHTUNG[2010/46]
English:LIGHTING MODULE, LAMP AND LIGHTING METHOD[2010/46]
French:MODULE D ÉCLAIRAGE, LAMPE ET PROCÉDÉ D ÉCLAIRAGE[2010/46]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2010National basic fee paid 
03.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/46]
27.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2014Fee for grant paid
16.10.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.10.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2013
Opposition(s)27.08.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.02.2009
BG26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
MK26.11.2014
MT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
TR26.11.2014
AT06.02.2015
IE06.02.2015
LU06.02.2015
GB26.02.2015
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/39]HU06.02.2009
BG26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
MT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
TR26.11.2014
AT06.02.2015
IE06.02.2015
LU06.02.2015
GB26.02.2015
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2017/03]CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
MT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
AT06.02.2015
IE06.02.2015
LU06.02.2015
GB26.02.2015
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2016/25]CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
AT06.02.2015
IE06.02.2015
LU06.02.2015
GB26.02.2015
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2016/12]CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
IE06.02.2015
LU06.02.2015
GB26.02.2015
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2016/07]CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
IE06.02.2015
LU06.02.2015
GB26.02.2015
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/47]CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
LU06.02.2015
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/46]CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
LU06.02.2015
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/44]CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
LU06.02.2015
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/37]CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/36]CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/35]CY26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/26]CY26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/24]ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/23]ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/22]LT26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
Former [2015/20]LT26.11.2014
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2006152820  (LIEN CHIN-CHUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,9,11,12,14-16,19,21,24-27,31-35 * page 3, paragraph 37 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 5-8,17,18,22,23,28;
 [X]US6758582  (HSIAO YA-KUANG [TW], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,21,24-28,31-35 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 11 * * column 3, line 31 - line 62 * * column 4, line 4 - line 15 * * figures 3-6 *;
 [X]EP1255132  (LUMILEDS LIGHTING LLC [US]) [X] 1-4,9,11,12,14-16,19,21,24-27,31-35 * column 4, line 42 - line 53 * * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 16 * * column 8, line 17 - line 40 * * figures 5A,5D-G,12 *;
 [YA]US6582103  (POPOVICH JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 5-8,18,28 * column 3, line 46 - line 57 * * column 4, line 3 - line 11 * * column 5, line 24 - line 31 * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 34 * * column 8, line 30 - line 56 * * column 9, line 66 - column 10, line 19 * * figures 1-4,8-11 * [A] 1-4,9,14-17,19,21,24,26,27,31-35;
 [YA]DE102004043516  (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 17 * page 3, paragraphs 19,20 * * figure 1 * [A] 1-16,21,25,26,31,35;
 [YA]EP1453107  (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [Y] 22,23 * column 19, line 25 - line 37 * * column 21, line 52 - column 22, line 9 * * column 23, line 35 - column 24, line 16 * * column 25, line 11 - line 17 * * column 26, line 30 - column 27, line 35 * * column 45, line 33 - line 45 * * column 49, line 13 - line 32 * * figures 1,2,4a-e,6-8,11,12,18a-d,19a-c,41,99 * [A] 1-5,9,11,12,14,16-19,21,25-28,31,33-35
by applicantUS2006152820