Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2257624

EP2257624 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.03.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BicycleRD Limited
B900
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge
CB22 3AT / GB
[2018/20]
Former [2018/12]For all designated states
BicycleRD Limited
Meditrina
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB
Former [2013/09]For all designated states
Bicycle Therapeutics Limited
Meditrina
Babraham Research Campus
Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB
Former [2012/10]For all designated states
Medical Research Council
2nd Floor, David Phillips Building
Polaris House, North Star Avenue
Swindon, SN2 1FL / GB
Former [2010/49]For all designated states
Medical Research Council
20 Park Crescent
London W1B 1AL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / WINTER, Gregory
MRC Laboratory of Molecular Biology
Hills road
Cambridge CB2 0QH / GB
02 / HEINIS, Christian
Ecole Polytechnique Federal de Lausanne (EPFL)
Laboratory of Therapeutic Peptides and Proteins
BCH 5305
CH-1015 Lausanne / CH
 [2012/17]
Former [2010/49]01 / WINTER, Gregory
MRC Laboratory of Molecular Biology Hills road
Cambridge CB2 0QH / GB
02 / HEINIS, Christian
Ecole Polytechnique Federal de Lausanne (EPFL) Laboratory of Therapeutic Peptides and Proteins BCH 5305
CH-1015 Lausanne / CH
Representative(s)Maschio, Antonio , et al
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/17]Maschio, Antonio , et al
Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP
20 Carlton Crescent
Southampton
SO15 2ET / GB
Former [2011/45]Maschio, Antonio , et al
Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP
10 Carlton Crescent
Southampton
SO15 2EZ / GB
Former [2010/49]Maschio, Antonio
Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton
SO15 2EZ / GB
Application number, filing date09708496.604.02.2009
[2010/49]
WO2009GB00301
Priority number, dateGB2008000207905.02.2008         Original published format: GB 0802079
GB2008001839908.10.2008         Original published format: GB 0818399
[2010/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009098450
Date:13.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2257624
Date:08.12.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009
[2010/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2257624
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/17]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2257624
Date:01.08.2012
[2012/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/10, C40B30/04, C40B40/02, C40B40/08, C40B50/06, G01N33/569, G01N33/68, A61K47/48, C07K1/107
[2011/41]
Former International [2010/49]C12N15/10, C40B40/02, C40B30/04, G01N33/68, A61K47/48
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2010/49]
English:METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS[2010/49]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS[2010/49]
Entry into regional phase06.09.2010National basic fee paid 
06.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/49]
14.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2012Fee for grant paid
02.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12151953.2  / EP2474613
EP13167202.4  / EP2653543
EP13167203.2  / EP2653544
EP13167204.0  / EP2653545
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.01.2013  07.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Pepscan Systems B.V.
Zuidersluisweg 2
8243 RC Lelystad / NL
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus, et al
Brienner Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2019/41]
Former [2018/13]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2013  07.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Pepscan Systems B.V.
Zuidersluisweg 2
8243 RC Lelystad / NL
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner, et al
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2013  07.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Pepscan Systems B.V.
Zuidersluisweg 2
8243 RC Lelystad / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O., et al
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2013/10]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2013   
Pepscan Systems B.V.
Zuidersluisweg 2
8243 RC Lelystad / NL
Opponent's representative
Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al
VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
05.03.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.11.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
05.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.06.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition05.08.2015Appeal received No.  T1573/15
15.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201103   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2011
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.02.2009
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
MK25.04.2012
MT25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
TR25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
LU04.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
MK25.04.2012
MT25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
TR25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/32]CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
MT25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/42]CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/34]CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
GR26.07.2012
Former [2013/10]CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
Former [2013/09]CY25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
Former [2012/51]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
Former [2012/50]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
GR26.07.2012
Former [2012/49]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
Former [2012/48]FI25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
Former [2012/47]LT25.04.2012
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO02077182  (XENOPORT INC [US], et al) [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0123619  (XENOPORT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0105950  (MORPHOSYS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006095345  (UNIV RAMOT [IL], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO2006078161  (PEPSCAN SYSTEMS BV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO2004077062  (PEPSCAN SYSTEMS BV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9836743  (CYPROS PHARM CORP [US]) [X] 25-28 * Compounds CYP-PA2, CYP-PA4 *;
 [DA]  - DWYER M A ET AL, "Biosynthetic Phage Display: A Novel Protein Engineering Tool Combining Chemical and Genetic Diversity", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20000301), vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 1074-5521, pages 263 - 274, XP002989574 [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(00)00102-2
 [DA]  - JESPERS LAURENT ET AL, "Selection of optical biosensors from chemisynthetic antibody libraries.", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, DESIGN & SELECTION : PEDS OCT 2004, (200410), vol. 17, no. 10, ISSN 1741-0126, pages 709 - 713, XP002535021 [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/PROTEIN/GZH083
 [DA]  - WOIWODE T F ET AL, "Synthetic compound libraries displayed on the surface of encoded bacteriophage", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20030901), vol. 10, no. 9, ISSN 1074-5521, pages 847 - 858, XP002287083 [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2003.08.005
 [DA]  - TIMMERMAN P ET AL, "Rapid and quantitative cyclization of multiple peptide loops onto synthetic scaffolds for structural mimicry of protein surfaces", CHEMBIOCHEM - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, (20050501), vol. 6, no. 5, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 821 - 824, XP002378236 [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200400374
 [DA]  - KATHER ET AL, "A Stable Disulfide-free Gene-3-protein of Phage fd Generated by In vitro Evolution", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20051202), vol. 354, no. 3, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 666 - 678, XP005165892 [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2005.09.086
 [X]  - VAN DEN HOUT KELLY P ET AL, "Tuning the stacking properties of C3-symmetrical molecules by modifying a dipeptide motif.", CHEMISTRY (WEINHEIM AN DER BERGSTRASSE, GERMANY) 2007, (2007), vol. 13, no. 29, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 8111 - 8123, XP002543649 [X] 25-28 * compounds 3,8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.200700630
 [X]  - TROUCHE NATHALIE ET AL, "Small multivalent architectures mimicking homotrimers of the TNF superfamily member CD40L: delineating the relationship between structure and effector function.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 7 NOV 2007, (20071107), vol. 129, no. 44, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 13480 - 13492, XP002543650 [X] 25-28 * Compounds of Scheme 1, in particular compound I *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA073169M
 [X]  - FICHTER KATYE M ET AL, "Peptide-functionalized poly(ethylene glycol) star polymers: DNA delivery vehicles with multivalent molecular architecture.", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY JAN 2008, (200801), vol. 19, no. 1, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 76 - 88, XP002543651 [X] 25-28 * figure 1a *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc0701141
 [X]  - RANGANATHAN D ET AL, "DESIGN AND SYNTHESIS OF AB3-TYPE (A=1,3,5-BENZENETRICARBONYL UNIT; B=GLU DIOME OR GLU7 OCTA OME) PEPTIDE DENDRIMERS: CRYSTAL STRUCTURE OF THE FIRST GENERATION", BIOPOLYMERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20000101), vol. 54, no. 4, ISSN 0006-3525, pages 289 - 295, XP001040555 [X] 25-28 * compound 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-0282(20001005)54:4<289::AID-BIP60>3.0.CO;2-7
 [X]  - KLOK H-A ET AL, "STAR-SHAPED FLUORESCENT POLYPEPTIDES", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, XX, (20010101), vol. 39, no. 10, pages 1572 - 1582, XP001061864 [X] 25-28 * Products in schemes 2 and 3 *
 [X]  - GUARISE C ET AL, "Fully symmetrical functionalization of multivalent scaffold molecules on solid support", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 62, no. 50, ISSN 0040-4020, (20061211), pages 11670 - 11674, (20061211), XP025002975 [X] 25-28 * Compounds in Table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2006.09.053
 [X]  - SCHMUCK CARSTEN ET AL, "Solid phase synthesis of a prototype of a new class of biomimetic receptors for anionic carbohydrates.", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY 7 MAR 2007, (20070307), vol. 5, no. 5, ISSN 1477-0520, pages 787 - 791, XP002543652 [X] 25-28 * compound 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b613660e
 [X]  - ADLER-ABRAMOVICH LIHI ET AL, "Controlled assembly of peptide nanotubes triggered by enzymatic activation of self-immolative dendrimers.", CHEMBIOCHEM : A EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL BIOLOGY 25 MAY 2007, (20070525), vol. 8, no. 8, ISSN 1439-4227, pages 859 - 862, XP002543654 [X] 25-28 * compound 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/CBIC.200700103
 [X]  - SUN SHUGUANG ET AL, "Thermodynamic studies on the recognition of flexible peptides by transition-metal complexes", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON.; US, vol. 41, no. 6, ISSN 0022-3263, (20020101), pages 1584 - 1590, (20020222), XP002509071 [X] 25-28 * Compounds in Table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/IC0108742
 [PX]  - GUARISE, CRISTIAN; ZAUPA, GIOVANNI; PRINS, LEONARD J.; SCRIMM, PAOLO, "Functionalization of tripodal scaffold molecules on solid support", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20080530), no. 20, pages 3559 - 3568, XP002543655 [PX] 25-28 * Compound 1a *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/EJOC.200800259
by applicant   - JESPERS, PROTEIN ENGINEERING DESIGN AND SELECTION, (2004), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 709 - 713
    - DWYER ET AL., CHEM BIOL, (2000), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 263 - 274
    - MILLWARD ET AL., CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 2, no. 9, pages 625 - 634
    - WANG L, ZHANG Z, BROCK A, SCHULTZ PG, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (20030107), vol. 100, no. 1, pages 56 - 61
    - BIOORG MED CHEM LETT., (20061015), vol. 16, no. 20, pages 5356 - 9
    - CHIN JW, SANTORO SW, MARTIN AB, KING DS, WANG L, SCHULTZ PG, J AM CHEM SOC., (20020807), vol. 124, no. 31, pages 9026 - 7
    - DEITERS A, CROPP TA, MUKHERJI M, CHIN JW, ANDERSON JC, SCHULTZ PG, "Adding amino acids with novel reactivity to the genetic code of Saccharomyces cerevisiae", J AM CHEM SOC., (20031001), vol. 125, no. 39, doi:doi:10.1021/ja0370037, pages L 1782 - 3, XP002469881

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0370037
    - TSAO ML, TIAN F, SCHULTZ PG, "Selective Staudinger modification of proteins containing p-azidophenylalanine", CHEMBIOCHEM., (200512), vol. 6, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1002/CBIC.200500314, pages 2147 - 9, XP002539783

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/CBIC.200500314
    - DEITERS A, SCHULTZ PG, "In vivo incorporation of an alkyne into proteins in Escherichia coli", BIOORG MED CHEM LETT., (20050301), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2004.12.065, pages 1521 - 4, XP004750702

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2004.12.065
    - ANGEW CHEM INT ED ENGL., (2008), vol. 47, no. 43, pages 8220 - 3
    - XIE J, LIU W, SCHULTZ PG, "A genetically encoded bidentate, metal-binding amino acid", ANGEW CHEM INT ED ENGL., (2007), vol. 46, no. 48, pages 9239 - 42
    - "Protein evolution with an expanded genetic code", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (20081118), vol. 105, no. 46, pages 17688 - 93
    - TIAN F, TSAO ML, SCHULTZ PG, J AM CHEM SOC., (20041215), vol. 126, no. 49, pages 15962 - 3
    - CHIN JW, MARTIN AB, KING DS, WANG L, SCHULTZ PG, "Addition of a photocrosslinking amino acid to the genetic code of Escherichiacoli", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (20020820), vol. 99, no. 17, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.172226299, pages 11020 - 4, XP002405594

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.172226299
    - YANAGISAWA T, ISHII R, FUKUNAGA R, KOBAYASHI T, SAKAMOTO K, YOKOYAMA S, CHEM BIOL., (20081124), vol. 15, no. 11, pages 1187 - 97
    - NEUMANN H, PEAK-CHEW SY, CHIN JW, NAT CHEM BIOL., (20080217), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 232 - 4
    - RYU Y, SCHULTZ PG, NAT METHODS, (200604), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 263 - 5
    - FARRELL IS, TORONEY R, HAZEN JL, MEHL RA, CHIN JW, "Photo-cross-linking interacting proteins with a genetically encoded benzophenone", NAT METHODS, (200505), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 377 - 84
    - WANG K, NEUMANN H, PEAK-CHEW SY, CHIN JW, "Evolved orthogonal ribosomes enhance the efficiency of synthetic genetic code expansion", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (200707), vol. 25, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1314, pages 770 - 7, XP002478973

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1314
    - JESPERS ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING DESIGN AND SELECTION, (2004), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 709 - 713
    - MARKS ET AL., J.MOL.BIO, vol. 222, pages 581 - 597
    - "A fast and simple method for sequencing DNA cloned in the single-stranded bacteriophage M13", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1979), vol. 129, no. 1, pages 169 - 72
    - KRISTENSEN, P., WINTER, G., "Proteolytic selection for protein folding using filamentous bacteriophages", FOLD DES., (1998), vol. 3, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/S1359-0278(98)00044-3, pages 321 - 8, XP002114489

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-0278(98)00044-3
    - CHEN, HARRISON, "Cell-penetrating peptides in drug development: enabling intracellular targets", BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY TRANSACTIONS, (2007), vol. 35, page 821
    - DAWSON PE, MUIR TW, CLARK-LEWIS I, KENT, SBH, "Synthesis of Proteins by Native Chemical Ligation", SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, pages 776 - 779
    - CHANG TK, JACKSON DY, BURNIER JP, WELLS JA, "Subtiligase: a tool for semisynthesis of proteins", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (19941220), vol. 91, no. 26, pages 12544 - 8, XP002280083
    - HIKARI A.I. YOSHIHARA, SAMI MAHRUS, JAMES A. WELLS, "Tags for labeling protein N-termini with subtiligase for proteomics", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS TAGS FOR LABELING PROTEIN N-TERMINI WITH SUBTILIGASE FOR PROTEOMICS, (20081115), vol. 18, no. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.08.044, pages 6000 - 6003, XP025627190

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2008.08.044
    - LINDE ET AL., "Structure-activity relationship and metabolic stability studies of backbone cyclization and N-methylation of melanocortin peptides", PEPTIDE SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 90, pages 671 - 682
    - HESS ET AL., "backbone cyclic peptidomimetic melanocortin-4 receptor agonist as a novel orally administered drug lead for treating obesity", J. MED. CHEM., (2008), vol. 51, pages 1026 - 1034
    - WU, P., LEINONEN, J., KOIVUNEN, E., LANKINEN, H., STENMAN, U. H., "Identification of novel prostate-specific antigen-binding peptides modulating its enzyme activity", EUR J BIOCHEM, (2000), vol. 267, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1432-1327.2000.01696.x, pages 6212 - 20, XP002908115

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1327.2000.01696.x
    - HEKIM, C. ET AL., "Novel peptide inhibitors of human kallikrein 2", J BIOL CHEM, (2006), vol. 281, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M600014200, pages 12555 - 60, XP055056450

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M600014200
    - HANSEN, M. ET AL., "A urokinase-type plasminogen activator-inhibiting cyclic peptide with an unusual P2 residue and an extended protease binding surface demonstrates new modalities for enzyme inhibition", J BIOL CHEM, (2005), vol. 280, pages 38424 - 37
    - ANDERSEN, L. M., WIND, T., HANSEN, H. D., ANDREASEN, P. A., "A cyclic peptidylic inhibitor of murine urokinase-type plasminogen activator: changing species specificity by substitution of a single residue", BIOCHEM J, (2008), vol. 412, pages 447 - 57
    - KROOK, M., LINDBLADH, C., ERIKSEN, J. A., MOSBACH, K., "Selection of a cyclic nonapeptide inhibitor to alpha-chymotrypsin using a phage display peptide library", MOL DIVERS, (1997), vol. 3, pages 149 - 59
    - DENNIS, M. S. ET AL., "Peptide exosite inhibitors of factor Vlla as anticoagulants", NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, doi:doi:10.1038/35006574, pages 465 - 70, XP002155500

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35006574
    - HUANG, L. ET AL., "Novel peptide inhibitors of angiotensin-converting enzyme 2", J BIOL CHEM, (2003), vol. 278, pages 15532 - 40
    - KARASSEVA, N. G., GLINSKY, V. V., CHEN, N. X., KOMATIREDDY, R., QUINN, T. P., "Identification and characterization of peptides that bind human ErbB-2 selected from a bacteriophage display library", J PROTEIN CHEM, (2002), vol. 21, pages 287 - 96
    - HOUIMEL, M., MACH, J. P., CORTHESY-THEULAZ, I., CORTHESY, B., FISCH, I., "New inhibitors of Helicobacter pylori urease holoenzyme selected from phage-displayed peptide libraries", EURJ BIOCHEM, (1999), vol. 262, pages 774 - 80
    - LUNDER, M., BRATKOVIC, T., KREFT, S., STRUKELJ, B., "Peptide inhibitor of pancreatic lipase selected by phage display using different elution strategies", J LIPID RES, (2005), vol. 46, doi:doi:10.1194/jlr.M500048-JLR200, pages 1512 - 6, XP002695156

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1194/jlr.M500048-JLR200
    - SANSCHAGRIN, F., LEVESQUE, R. C., "A specific peptide inhibitor of the class B metallo-beta-lactamase L-1 from Stenotrophomonas maltophilia identified using phage display", J ANTIMICROB CHEM OTHER, (2005), vol. 55, pages 252 - 5
    - SPERINDE, J. J., CHOI, S. J., SZOKA, F. C., JR., "Phage display selection of a peptide DNase II inhibitor that enhances gene delivery", J GENE MED, (2001), vol. 3, pages 101 - 8
    - BLEICHER, K. H., BOHM, H. J., MULLER, K., ALANINE, A. I, "Hit and lead generation: beyond high-throughput screening", NOT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2003), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd1086, pages 369 - 78, XP055051971

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd1086
    - MARKS, J. D., HOOGENBOOM, H. R., GRIFFITHS, A. D., WINTER, G., "Molecular evolution of proteins on filamentous phage. Mimicking the strategy of the immune system", J BIOL CHEM, (1992), vol. 267, pages 16007 - 10, XP002025816
    - JESPERS, L. S., ROBERTS, A., MAHLER, S. M., WINTER, G., HOOGENBOOM, H. R., "Guiding the selection of human antibodies from phage display repertoires to a single epitope of an antigen", BIOTECHNOLOGY (N Y, (1994), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0994-899, pages 899 - 903, XP002155177

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0994-899
    - HUDSON, P. J., SOURIAU, C., "Engineered antibodies", NOT MED, (2003), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1038/nm0103-129, pages 129 - 34, XP002338941

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0103-129
    - DOYON, J. B., SNYDER, T. M., LIU, D. R., "Highly sensitive in vitro selections for DNA- linked synthetic small molecules with protein binding affinity and specificity", J AM CHEM SOC, (2003), vol. 125, doi:doi:10.1021/ja036065u, pages 12372 - 3, XP001172427

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja036065u
    - WOIWODE, T. F. ET AL., "Synthetic compound libraries displayed on the surface of encoded bacteriophage", CHEM BIOL, (2003), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1016/j.chembiol.2003.08.005, pages 847 - 58, XP002287083

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2003.08.005
    - BRENNER, S., LERNER, R. A., "Encoded combinatorial chemistry", PROC NOTI ACAD SCI U S A, (1992), vol. 89, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.89.12.5381, pages 5381 - 3, XP000647936

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.12.5381
    - HALPIN, D. R., HARBURY, P. B., "DNA display II. Genetic manipulation of combinatorial chemistry libraries for small-molecule evolution", PLOS BIOL, (2004), vol. 2, page E174
    - JESPERS, L., BONNERT, T. P., WINTER, G., "Selection of optical biosensors from chemisynthetic antibody libraries", PROTEIN ENG DES SEL, (2004), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1093/PROTEIN/GZH083, pages 709 - 13, XP002535021

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/PROTEIN/GZH083
    - TIMMERMAN, P., BELD, J., PUIJK, W. C., MELOEN, R. H., "Rapid and quantitative cyclization of multiple peptide loops onto synthetic scaffolds for structural mimicry of protein surfaces", CHEMBIOCHEM, (2005), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1002/cbic.200400374, pages 821 - 4, XP002378236

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cbic.200400374
    - DRIGGERS, E. M., HALE, S. P., LEE, J., TERRETT, N. K., "The exploration of macrocycles for drug discovery--an underexploited structural class", NOT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2008), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd2590, pages 608 - 24, XP055151640

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd2590
    - WESSJOHANN, L. A., RUIJTER, E., GARCIA-RIVERA, D., BRANDT, W., "What can a chemist learn from nature's macrocycles?--a brief, conceptual view", MOL DIVERS, (2005), vol. 9, pages 171 - 86, XP019258593
    - KEMP, D. S., MCNAMARA, P. E., "Conformationally restricted cyclic nonapeptides derived from L-cysteine and LL-3-amino-2-piperidino-6-carboxylic acid (LL-acp), a potent b-turn-inducing dipeptide analogue", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1985), vol. 50, pages 5834 - 5838
    - KATHER, I., BIPPES, C. A., SCHMID, F. X., "A stable disulfide-free gene-3-protein of phage fd generated by in vitro evolution", J MOL BIOL, (2005), vol. 354, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jmb.2005.09.086, pages 666 - 78, XP005165892

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2005.09.086
    - CHENG, Y., PRUSOFF, W. H., "Relationship between the inhibition constant (Kl) and the concentration of inhibitor which causes 50 per cent inhibition (150) of an enzymatic reaction", BIOCHEM PHARMACOL, (1973), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/0006-2952(73)90196-2, pages 3099 - 108, XP001106687

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(73)90196-2
    - DENNIS, M. S. ET AL., "Peptide exosite inhibitors of factor Vila as anticoagulants", NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, doi:doi:10.1038/35006574, pages 465 - 70, XP002155500

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35006574
    - JACKSON, D. Y. ET AL., "A designed peptide ligase for total synthesis of ribonuclease A with unnatural catalytic residues", SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 266, doi:doi:10.1126/science.7939659, pages 243 - 7, XP001246800

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7939659
    - ABBENANTE, G., FAIRLIE, D. P., "Protease inhibitors in the clinic", MED CHEM, (2005), vol. 1, pages 71 - 104
    - TURK, B., "Targeting proteases: successes, failures and future prospects", NOT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2006), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd2092, pages 785 - 99, XP002556191

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd2092
    - MELKKO, S., SCHEUERMANN, J., DUMELIN, C. E., NERI, D., "Encoded self-assembling chemical libraries", NOT BIOTECHNOL, (2004), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1038/NBT961, pages 568 - 74, XP002541364

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT961
    - LI, S., ROBERTS, R. W., "A novel strategy for in vitro selection of peptide-drug conjugates", CHEM BIOL, (2003), vol. 10, pages 233 - 9
    - MILLWARD, S. W., TAKAHASHI, T. T., ROBERTS, R. W., "A general route for post-translational cyclization of mRNA display libraries", J AM CHEM SOC, (2005), vol. 127, doi:doi:10.1021/ja054373h, pages 14142 - 3, XP008119248

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja054373h
    - MILLWARD, S. W., FIACCO, S., AUSTIN, R. J., ROBERTS, R. W., "Design of cyclic peptides that bind protein surfaces with antibody-like affinity", ACS CHEM BIOL, (2007), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1021/CB7001126, pages 625 - 34, XP002616292

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/CB7001126