Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2250631

EP2250631 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR PRESERVING PRIVACY IN AN RFID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2014
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neology, Inc.
13000 Gregg Street, Suite A
Poway, CA 92064 / US
[2010/46]
Inventor(s)01 / NYALAMADUGU, Sheshidher
12461 Heatherton Ct. 312
San Diego CA 92128 / US
02 / LIU, Jun
12290 Corte Sabio 3206
San Diego CA 92128 / US
03 / MARTINEZ DE VELASCO CORTINA, Francisco
1911 Parkview Terrace
La Jolla CA 92037 / US
 [2010/46]
Representative(s)Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/31]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
Former [2010/46]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
Former [2010/46]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date09708616.902.02.2009
[2010/46]
WO2009US32840
Priority number, dateUS20080025000P31.01.2008         Original published format: US 25000 P
[2010/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009100005
Date:13.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2250631
Date:17.11.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009
[2010/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2250631
Date:31.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.12.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/073, G06K19/077, G08B13/14, H01Q1/24
[2011/23]
Former International [2010/46]G08B13/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/46]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM BEWAHREN DER PRIVATSPHÄRE IN EINEM RFID-SYSTEM[2010/46]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR PRESERVING PRIVACY IN AN RFID SYSTEM[2010/46]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR PRÉSERVER LA CONFIDENTIALITÉ DANS UN SYSTÈME RFID[2010/46]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2010National basic fee paid 
31.08.2010Search fee paid 
31.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/46]
02.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2013Fee for grant paid
20.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.01.2012
Opposition(s)02.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.02.2009
AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MK31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
TR31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
IE02.02.2014
LU02.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/33]HU02.02.2009
AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
TR31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
IE02.02.2014
LU02.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/32]HU02.02.2009
AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
IE02.02.2014
LU02.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/25]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
BG31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
IE02.02.2014
LU02.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/12]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
MT31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
IE02.02.2014
LU02.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/07]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
IE02.02.2014
LU02.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
LU02.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/44]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
MC31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
LU02.02.2014
Former [2014/24]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
ES31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
IT31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/23]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
CZ31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
EE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
SK31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/22]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
RO31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/21]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
DK31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/18]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
CY31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/14]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
NL31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
CY11.09.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/12]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
LV31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
SI31.07.2013
CY11.09.2013
NO31.10.2013
GR01.11.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/11]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
FI31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
PL31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
CY11.09.2013
NO31.10.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/10]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
CY11.09.2013
NO31.10.2013
IS30.11.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/09]AT31.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
HR31.07.2013
LT31.07.2013
SE31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT31.07.2013
NO31.10.2013
PT02.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO31.10.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2757952  (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [X] 1-16 * page 5, line 7 - line 22 * * page 11, line 24 - page 13, line 29 * * figure 4 *;
 [X]US5337063  (TAKAHIRA KENICHI [JP]) [X] 1,14 * column 3, line 19 - column 5, line 43; figures 4,5 *;
 [E]EP2056234  (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [E] 1,14 * paragraphs [0052] , [0064] , [0065] , [0071]; figures 2-4 *;
 [X]DE19742126  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2003116634  (TANAKA MASAHIKO [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0051]; figure - *;
 [X]US2005237198  (WALDNER MICHELE A [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraph [0037]; figure 3 *;
 [X]EP1087332  (EM MICROELECTRONIC MARIN SA [CH]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0004] , [0022]; figures 8,12 *;
 [A]US2007075837  (TUTTLE MARK E [US] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0022] , [0035] , [0041] , [0042]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2005012616  (FORSTER IAN J [GB] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0050] , [0051] *
International search[X]US2007200681  (COLBY STEVEN M [US]);
 [Y]US2007210923  (BUTLER TIMOTHY P [US], et al);
 [A]US2003132301  (SELKER EDWIN JOSEPH [US])
by applicantFR2757952
 US5337063
 EP2056234
 DE19742126
 US2003116634
 US2005237198