Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2242304

EP2242304 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICE, BASE STATION DEVICE, WIRELESS CONTROL METHOD, AND MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.11.2015
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.12.2015  [2015/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2010/42]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAGI, Yuhsuke
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
02 / HIKOSO, Keiji
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
03 / SAKAMOTO, Mitsuru
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
04 / SHIMONABE, Tadashi
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
05 / OHSHIMA, Akira
c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
 [2010/42]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/42]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date09708689.602.02.2009
[2010/42]
WO2009JP51695
Priority number, dateJP2008002540105.02.2008         Original published format: JP 2008025401
[2010/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009099024
Date:13.08.2009
Language:JA
[2009/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2242304
Date:20.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.08.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/10, H04B7/06, H04W88/02, H04L5/00
[2014/24]
Former International [2010/42]H04W24/10, H04B7/06, H04W88/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/42]
TitleGerman:MOBILE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG, BASISSTATION, DRAHTLOSES STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND MOBILES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2010/42]
English:MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICE, BASE STATION DEVICE, WIRELESS CONTROL METHOD, AND MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2010/42]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE SANS FIL, ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE[2010/42]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2010Translation filed 
12.08.2010National basic fee paid 
12.08.2010Search fee paid 
12.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
12.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/42]
26.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/49]
16.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.02.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2006209732  (GOROKHOV ALEXEI [US], et al) [Y] 6 * claims 1,3 *;
 [XYI]  MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC, "UL Sounding RS Control Signaling for Closed Loop Antenna Selection", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-080017, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080108), vol. RAN WG1, no. Sevilla, Spain; 20080108, XP050108563 [X] 1,2,5,7-20 * tables 1,2 * * page 2, line 22 - line 40 * * page 3, line 2 - line 4 * * page 4, line 7 * [Y] 6 [I] 3,4
    [XAYI] MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ET AL, "Adaptive antenna switching with low sounding reference signal overhead", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-073067, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070620), vol. RAN WG1, no. Orlando, USA; 20070620, XP050106722 [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * page 1, line 1 - line 2 * * page 2, line 1 - line 10; figure 2 * [A] 9-20 [Y] 6 [I] 3,4
 [XAY]  HONGYUAN ZHANG ET AL, "Applying Antenna Selection in WLANs for Achieving Broadband Multimedia Communications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BROADCASTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20061201), vol. 52, no. 4, doi:10.1109/TBC.2006.884831, ISSN 0018-9316, pages 475 - 482, XP011150607 [X] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * right-hand column; page 478 * [A] 3-5,9-20 [Y] 6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBC.2006.884831
    [XAYI] MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ET AL, "Low cost training for transmit antenna selection on the uplink", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-063089, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20061101), vol. RAN WG1, no. Riga, Latvia; 20061101, XP050103548 [X] 1,2,7,8 * page 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 4, line 1 - line 14 * [A] 3,5,9-20 [Y] 6 [I] 4
 [XAI]  "IEEE P802.11n?/D2.02 Draft STANDARD for Information Technology- Telecommunications and information exchange between systems- Local and metropolitan area networks- Specific requirements- Part 11: Wireless LAN Medium Access Control (MAC) and Physical Layer (PHY) specifications: Amendment 4(# 933): Enh", IEEE DRAFT; 11-07-0595-00-000N-TGN-REDLINE-D202-CMP-D200-INSERTIONS, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20070503), vol. 802.11n, pages 1 - 488, XP017630614 [X] 9-11,14-16,18,19 * page 155, line 40 - line 61 * * page 156, line 6 - line 24; figure 181o * [A] 1-8,13,20 [I] 12,17
International search[XP]JP2008199424
 [X]  MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC, "UL Sounding RS Control Signaling for Closed Loop Antenna Selection", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #51bis R1-080017, XP050108563 [X]
 [A]  NTT DOCOMO ET AL., "Closed Loop Antenna Switching in E-UTRA Uplink", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #48 R1-070860, XP008138955 [A]