blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2245494 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2245494



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 380
09.08.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.07.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.07.2019 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
11.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.07.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.05.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.05.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.05.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.04.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
11.04.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
11.04.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
30.01.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
30.01.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.11.2018 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
15.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
15.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
15.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
15.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.10.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.08.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.08.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.04.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.04.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.12.2017 Drawings Search / examination 2
13.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.10.2017 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
22.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
22.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
22.09.2017 Claims Search / examination 6
22.09.2017 Claims Search / examination 6
22.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.09.2017 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
13.07.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
18.04.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.04.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.04.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.11.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
31.08.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
30.08.2016 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
24.08.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.07.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 27
04.07.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.07.2015 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
15.07.2015 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 3
29.05.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.05.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.05.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.05.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
06.05.2015 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
05.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.05.2015 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
29.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.04.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 4
22.04.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
15.04.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
27.03.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
26.02.2015 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
19.02.2015 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
26.01.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
27.05.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.10.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.08.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
11.08.2012 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 9
11.08.2012 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 9
24.05.2012 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
18.05.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
11.05.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.05.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
03.05.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 5
15.03.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.03.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.02.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
23.02.2012 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
23.02.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 3
23.02.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 1
07.01.2012 Request for a decision Search / examination 1
04.01.2012 Request for a decision Search / examination 1
09.11.2011 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
24.05.2011 Request for a decision Search / examination 2
23.05.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.05.2011 Request for a decision Search / examination 2
18.03.2011 Claim deemed abandoned Search / examination 2
18.03.2011 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
01.03.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
01.03.2011 Request for further processing Search / examination 7
28.02.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
28.02.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.02.2011 Request for further processing Search / examination 7
21.12.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
06.10.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.09.2010 Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
11.09.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
01.09.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
25.06.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
08.09.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
20.08.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
20.08.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
20.08.2009 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 28
22.06.2009 Urgent incoming letter to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
29.05.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
29.05.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
29.05.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
03.02.2009 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
03.02.2009 Claims PCT receiving Office 8
03.02.2009 Description PCT receiving Office 11
03.02.2009 Drawings PCT receiving Office 7