Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2240591

EP2240591 - METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF ETHANOL FROM TWO DIFFERENT STARTING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.10.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2017Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sekab E-Technology AB
Box 286
891 24 Örnsköldsvik / SE
[2010/42]
Inventor(s)01 / ÖHGREN GREDEGÅRD, Karin
Nils Holgerssons väg 3
S-224 66 Lund / SE
02 / ZACCHI, Guido
Holmviksgatan 5
S-214 58 Malmö / SE
 [2011/25]
Former [2010/42]01 / ÖHGREN GREDEGÅRD, Karin
Sofiavägen 3E
S-222 41 Lund / SE
02 / ZACCHI, Guido
Holmviksgatan 5
S-214 58 Malmö / SE
Representative(s)Kransell & Wennborg KB
P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
[2013/47]
Former [2011/12]Wirén, Anders , et al
Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
Former [2010/42]Wirén, Anders
Awapatent AB Drottninggatan 89 Box 45086
S-104 30 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date09710344.410.02.2009
[2010/42]
WO2009SE00078
Priority number, dateSE2008000030411.02.2008         Original published format: SE 0800304
[2010/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009102256
Date:20.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2240591
Date:20.10.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009
[2010/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2240591
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12P7/06, C12P19/00, C12M1/36
[2012/27]
Former International [2010/42]C12P7/06, C12P19/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/42]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ETHANOL AUS ZWEI VERSCHIEDENEN STARTMATERIALIEN[2010/42]
English:METHOD OF PRODUCTION OF ETHANOL FROM TWO DIFFERENT STARTING MATERIALS[2010/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ÉTHANOL À PARTIR DE DEUX MATÉRIAUX DIFFÉRENTS DE DÉPART[2010/42]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2010National basic fee paid 
22.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
22.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/42]
13.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.10.2012Fee for grant paid
03.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12192280.1  / EP2562262
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.01.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.08.2013  22.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2013/40]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.2013  22.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/39]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.2013  22.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Opponent's representative
Stevens, Ian Edward
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
16.09.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
19.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.10.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
28.06.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.07.2016
05.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
26.07.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition03.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2184/16
05.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
26.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2184/16
23.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
IS14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MK14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
IE10.02.2013
LU10.02.2013
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
[2016/32]
Former [2015/34]AT14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MK14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
IE10.02.2013
LU10.02.2013
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2015/32]AT14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MK14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
IE10.02.2013
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2014/32]AT14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
IE10.02.2013
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2014/07]AT14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
IE10.02.2013
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/52]AT14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/48]AT14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/42]AT14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/37]AT14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/35]AT14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/28]FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/26]FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/24]FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/20]NO14.02.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]  - ÖHGREN ET AL, "Simultaneous saccharification and co-fermentation of glucose and xylose in stem-pretreated corn stover at high fiber content with Saccharomyces cerevisiae TMB3400", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 126, pages 488 - 498, XP024956581 [Y] 1-13,18-25,28-31 * See page 493 (Table 3 and the end of section 3.3) and page 495 (right column/ enhanced ethanol yield) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2006.05.001
 [Y]  - LARSSON ET AL, "The generation of fermentation inhibitors during dilute acid hydrolysis of softwood", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 24, pages 151 - 159, XP003024061 [Y] 1-13,18-25,28-31 * See page 157 (Figure 5B and Table 2) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0141-0229(98)00101-X
 [Y]  - SZENGYEL ET AL, "Effect of acetic acid and furfural on cellulase production of Trichoderma reesei RUT C30", APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 89, pages 31 - 42, XP002537086 [Y] 1-13,18-25,28-31 * See pages 37-41 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/ABAB:89:1:31
 [A]  - SASSNER ET AL, "Techno-economic evaluation of bioethanol production from three different lignocellulosic materials", BIOMASS AND BIOENERGY, (20071211), vol. 32, pages 422 - 430, XP022664170 [A] 1-31 * See 428 (section 3.2.3); early online publication *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biombioe.2007.10.014
 [A]  - HAHN-HÄGERDAL ET AL, "Bio-ethanol - the fuel of tomorrow from the residues of today", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20061016), vol. 24, pages 549 - 556, XP025052220 [A] 1-31 * See page 552 (right column) and page 553 (right column) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2006.10.004
 [PA]  - LINDE ET AL, "Bioethanol production from non-starch carbohydrate residues in process streams from a dry-mill ethanol plant", BIORESOURSE TECHNOLOGY, (20080220), vol. 99, pages 6505 - 6511, XP022679226 [PA] 1-31 * " See page 6509 (left column and Figure 5); early online publication *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biortech.2007.11.032