Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2245836

EP2245836 - DETERMINING A PROPERTY OF A COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Afilias Technologies Limited
4th Floor, International House
3 Harbourmaster Place
IFSC
Dublin 1 / IE
[2015/17]
Former [2012/15]For all designated states
Afilias Technologies Limited
2 La Touche House
IFSC
Dublin 1 / IE
Former [2010/44]For all designated states
MTLD Top Level Domain Limited
2 La Touche House IFSC
Dublin 1 / IE
Inventor(s)01 / PEARCE, James
MTLD Top Level Domain Limited
2 La Touche House
IFSC
Dublin 1 / IE
 [2017/27]
Former [2010/44]01 / PEARCE, James
MTLD Top Level Domain Limited 2 La Touche House IFSC
Dublin 1 / IE
Representative(s)Mathys & Squire
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/27]Gray, Peter John Bracey
Thompson Gray LLP
Central Court
25 Southampton Buildings
London WC2A 1AL / GB
Former [2010/44]Gray, Peter John Bracey
THOMPSON GRAY LLP Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings London
WC2A 1AL / GB
Application number, filing date09710546.412.02.2009
[2010/44]
WO2009GB00401
Priority number, dateGB2008000258512.02.2008         Original published format: GB 0802585
[2010/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009101414
Date:20.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2245836
Date:03.11.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009
[2010/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2245836
Date:05.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, G06F17/30, G06F17/22
[2010/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/27]
Former [2010/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG EINER EIGENSCHAFT EINER KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2010/44]
English:DETERMINING A PROPERTY OF A COMMUNICATION DEVICE[2010/44]
French:DÉTERMINATION D'UNE PROPRIÉTÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION[2010/44]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2010National basic fee paid 
12.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/44]
03.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2012Observations by third parties
04.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2015Observations by third parties
09.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2016
30.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
09.12.2016Observations by third parties
17.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
21.02.2017Fee for grant paid
21.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP17179439.9  / EP3264728
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.07.2017  11.07.2017  ADMISSIBLE
51DEGREES.MOBI LIMITED
5 Charlotte Close
Caversham
Reading
Berkshire RG4 7BY / GB
Opponent's representative
Cupitt, Philip Leslie
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
 [2018/22]
Former [2017/32]
Opponent(s)01  05.07.2017   
51DEGREES.MOBI LIMITED
5 Charlotte Close
Caversham
Reading
Berkshire RG4 7BY / GB
Opponent's representative
Finnegan Europe LLP
16 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7EG / GB
20.03.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.07.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.07.2019Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.11.2015Request for further processing filed
23.11.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.12.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
24.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
LU12.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2018/52]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
LU12.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/39]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/23]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
NO05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI05.07.2017
LT05.07.2017
NL05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT05.07.2017
NO05.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2002103881  (GRANADE FRANCOIS [US], et al) [X] 1-7,13,15,17-25 * paragraphs [0002] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0028]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0043] , [0044]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0053] - [0058]; figure 5 * * paragraphs [0068] - [0071]; figure 8 * [I] 8-12,14,16;
 [XI]US2002120684  (CHRISTFORT JACOB [US], et al) [X] 1-7,13,15,17-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] * * paragraphs [0135] - [0152]; figure 2 * [I] 8-12,14,16;
 [XI]US2003009567  (FAROUK ALAMGIR [US]) [X] 1-7,13,15,17-25 * paragraphs [0001] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0069] , [0070]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0088] , [0089] * [I] 8-12,14,16;
 [XI]US2004049574  (WATSON MARK ALEXANDER [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,13,15,17-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0166]; figures 1-18 * [I] 8-12,14,16;
 [XI]US2004015567  (ZIEBOLD GREGORY J [US], et al) [X] 1-7,13,15,17-25 * paragraphs [0003] - [0031] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0059]; figure 3 * [I] 8-12,14,16;
 [XI]US2005015365  (KAVACHERI SATHYANARAYANAN N [US], et al) [X] 1-7,13,15,17-25 * paragraphs [0005] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0070]; figures 2-8 * [I] 8-12,14,16;
 [XI]US2005015474  (KAVACHERI SATHYANARAYANAN N [US], et al) [X] 1-7,13,15,17-25 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0017] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0067]; figures 2-5 * [I] 8-12,14,16
by applicantUS2002103881
otherUS2002103881
OppositionUS2002103881
 US2002120684
 US2003009567
 US2004049574
 US2004015567
 US2005015365
 US2005015474
    - COMER, D., "Heuristics for Trie Index Minimization", Heuristics for Trie Index Minimization, (19770200), pages 1 - 24, XP055402255
    - AHO, A. et al., "advanced set representation methods", Data Structures and Algorithms, (19870000), pages 162 - 169, XP055402262
    - PASSANI, L. et al., "WAP Universal Resource File", sourceforge., (20021021), pages 1 - 27, URL: http://wurfl.sourceforge.net/wurfl.xml URL https://web.archive.org/web/20021021165257/http://wurfl.sourceforge.net/ wurfl.xm, XP055403028
    - ANONYMOUS, "What's the WURFL?", sourceforge.net, (20070313), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://wurfl.sourceforge.net/backgroundinfo.php https://web.archive.org/web/20070313231636/http://wurfl.sourceforge.net: 80/backgroundinfo.php), XP055403029
    - ANONYMOUS, "So, what can the WURFL do for me?", (20070312), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://wurfl.sourceforge.net/whatcanwurfldo.php, XP055403032
    - ANONYMOUS, "What's cool about the WURFL?", sourceforge, (20070312), URL: http://wurfl.sourceforge.net/smart.php https://web.archive.org/web/20070312030813/http://wurfl.sourceforge.net: 80/smart.php), XP055403033
    - PASSANI, L., "Welcome to the WURFL", sourceforge.net, (20070310), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://wurfl.sourceforge.net/index.php https://web.archive.org/web/20070310025034/http://wurfl.sourceforge.net: 80/index.php), XP055403034
    - PASSANI, L., "WURFL FAQ, Part 1: General about WURFL", sourceforge, (20070315), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://wurfl.sourceforge.net/faq1.php https://web.archive.org/web/20070315082531/http://wurfl.sourceforge.net: 80/faq1.php), XP055403036
    - PASSANI, L., "WURFL and Java: the obvious match", sourceforge.net, (20070303), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://wurfl.sourceforge.net/java/index.php https://web.archive.org/web/20070303115051/http://wurfl.sourceforge.net: 80/java/index.php), XP055403038
    - PASSANI, L., "WURFL Java API", sourceforge.net, (20070303), URL: http://wurfl.sourceforge.net/java/api.php https://web.archive.org/web/20070303113656/http://wurfl.sourceforge.net: 80/java/api.php), XP055403042
    - ANONYMOUS, "WURFL and Perl: Simple Perl WURFL Parser WURFLLite", sourceforge.net, (20070319), page 1, URL: http://wurfl.sourceforge.net:80/perl/index.php https://web.archive.org/web/20070319205834/http://wurfl.sourceforg e.net:80/perl/index.php), XP055403045
    - KAMERMAN, S., "Source for file tera_wurfl.php", devel.teratechnologies.net, (20070320), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://devel.teratechnologies.net/tera-wurfl/doc/__filesource/fsource_tera_ wurfl_tera_wurfl.php.html, XP055403049
    - ANONYMOUS, "Tera-WURFL README", devel.teratechnologies.net, (20070320), URL: http://devel.teratechnologies.net/tera-wurfl/doc/ric_README.html, XP055403050
    - ANONYMOUS, "Class: tera_wurfl", devel.teratechnologies .net, (20070318), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://devel.teratechnologies .net/tera-wurfl/doc/tera_wurfl/tera_wurfl.html, XP055403056
    - ANONYMOUS, "MySQL 3.23, 4.0, 4.1 Reference Manual", MySQL 3.23, 4.0, 4.1 Reference Manual, (20070302), pages 462 - 466, XP055403058
    - COMER, D., "The Ubiquitous B-tree'',", Computing Surveys, (19780600), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 121 - 137, XP058090636

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/356770.356776
    - "File Structures", Allen Kent, James G. Williams, Encyclopedia of Microcomputers, Volume 7 -Evolution of Computerized Maintenance Management to Generation of Random Numbers, Marcel Dekker, Inc.,, (19910000), pages 2pp, 209 - 213, XP055590530
    - Anonymous, "MySQL 3.23, 4.0, 4.1 Reference Manual", MySQL AB, (20070302), pages 462-466, 726-738, 852 - 858, XP055590551