Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2244832

EP2244832 - FAIL-SAFE METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ASPIRATING AND/OR DISPENSING LIQUIDS IN AUTOMATED LABORATORY INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beckman Coulter, Inc.
250 S. Kraemer Boulevard
Brea, CA 92821 / US
[2019/49]
Former [2010/44]For all designated states
Beckman Coulter, Inc.
250 S. Kraemer Boulevard
Brea, 92821 CA / US
Inventor(s)01 / XIN, Rongchang
8901 SW 160 Street
Palmetto Bay, FL 33157 / US
02 / GRACE, Eric, M.
2918 Dublin Circle
Cooper City, FL 33026 / US
03 / LI, William
9120 S.w. 171 Terrace
Miami, Florida 33157 / US
04 / VARGAS, Santos
16801 Nw 79 Place
Miami Lakes, FL 33016 / US
 [2010/44]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[2019/49]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2010/44]Draper, Martyn John
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date09713139.529.01.2009
[2010/44]
WO2009US32382
Priority number, dateUS2008003325419.02.2008         Original published format: US 33254
[2010/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009105318
Date:27.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2244832
Date:03.11.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2009
[2010/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2244832
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.08.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/02, G01F11/00, G01F23/74, // G01F11/02, B05B9/04
[2019/25]
Former International [2017/28]B01L3/02, G01F25/00, G01F11/00, G01F23/74, // G01F11/02, B05B9/04
Former International [2010/44]B01L3/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/49]
Former [2010/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:AUSFALLSICHERES VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ASPIRATION UND/ODER AUSGABE VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN BEI AUTOMATISIERTEN LABORINSTRUMENTEN[2010/44]
English:FAIL-SAFE METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ASPIRATING AND/OR DISPENSING LIQUIDS IN AUTOMATED LABORATORY INSTRUMENTS[2010/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SÉCURITÉ DESTINÉS À ASPIRER ET/OU À DÉLIVRER DES LIQUIDES DANS DES INSTRUMENTS DE LABORATOIRE AUTOMATISÉS[2010/44]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2010National basic fee paid 
18.08.2010Search fee paid 
18.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/44]
27.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2019Fee for grant paid
24.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2005062594  (TAKASHIMA SUMIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0033]-[0035] * [Y] 8,10 [I] 4,5,9;
 [XYI]US2472665  (BRUCE LADNER) [X] 1,2,7 * figures 1-4 * [Y] 8,10 [I] 9;
 [Y]US5085354  (SOGLIANI CLAUDIO [IT], et al) [Y] 8,10 * column 3, line 23 - line 48 *;
 [A]US3817274  (ANDERSON H) [A] 1-10 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5875921  (OSGAR MICHAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 3,6,7,8 *
International search[Y]US5875921  (OSGAR MICHAEL L [US], et al);
 [Y]US6513378  (LOVE JR H WORTH [US]);
 [Y]US5085354  (SOGLIANI CLAUDIO [IT], et al);
 [A]US2006127281  (BJORNSON TORLEIF O [US], et al);
 [A]US7275430  (ZULETA MARCO [US], et al)