Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2248020

EP2248020 - MANAGING USE OF STORAGE BY MULTIPLE PAGEABLE GUESTS OF A COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.07.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/45]For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION
New Orchard Road
Armonk, New York 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SZWED, Peter, Kenneth
14 Livingstone Street
Rhinebeck New York 12572 / US
02 / OSISEK, Damian
4605 Salem Drive
Vestal New York 13850-3854 / US
03 / HELLER, Lisa
215 Knollwood Road
Rhinebeck New York 12572 / US
04 / FARRELL, Mark
38 Stirrup Lane
Pleasant Valley New York 12569 / US
05 / GAINEY JR, Charles
21 James Street
Poughkeepsie New York 12603-1524 / US
06 / GREINER, Dan
1615 Tiffany Way
San Jose California 95125-5021 / US
 [2010/45]
Representative(s)Litherland, David Peter
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/45]Roberts, Scott Anthony
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date09714605.416.02.2009
[2010/45]
WO2009EP51799
Priority number, dateUS2008003116025.02.2008         Original published format: US 31160
US2008005267520.03.2008         Original published format: US 52675
US2008005268320.03.2008         Original published format: US 52683
[2010/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009106451
Date:03.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2248020
Date:10.11.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009
[2010/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/07
[2010/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/45]
TitleGerman:VERWALTUNG DER SPEICHERVERWENDUNG MEHRERER ERFASSBARER BENUTZER EINER COMPUTERUMGEBUNG[2010/45]
English:MANAGING USE OF STORAGE BY MULTIPLE PAGEABLE GUESTS OF A COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT[2010/45]
French:GESTION DE L'UTILISATION DE SUPPORT DE MÉMORISATION PAR DE MULTIPLES CLIENTS ACCESSIBLES PAR RADIOMESSAGERIE D'UN ENVIRONNEMENT INFORMATIQUE[2010/45]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2010National basic fee paid 
22.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/45]
12.10.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
05.01.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
09.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination04.03.2015Appeal received No.  T1701/15
19.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.06.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
18.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
15.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
15.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
16.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
15.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006206687  (VEGA RENE A [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0025] , [0028] - [0030] - [0041] , [0047]; figure 2 *;
 [X]US7089377  (CHEN XIAOXIN [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 50 - column 5, paragraph 18 * * column 9, line 31 - column 10, line 23 * * column 12, line 12 - line 21 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 4 * * figures 1,4-6 *;
 [A]  - "Logical Partition Security in the IBM eserver pSeries 690", IBM WHITE PAPER, XX, XX, (20020201), pages 1 - 13, XP002361913 [A] 1-6 * column W *
by applicantUS2006206687
 US7089377