Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2291147

EP2291147 - PARTIAL JOINT RESURFACING IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/10]PARTIAL JOINT RESURFACING IMPLANT, INSTRUMENTATION, AND METHOD
[2018/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BioPoly, LLC
7136 Gettysburg Pike
Fort Wayne, IN 46804 / US
[2018/41]
Former [2011/10]For all designated states
BIOPOLY, LLC
3201 Stellhorn Road
Fort Wayne, IN 46815 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SCHWARTZ, Herbert E.
11702 Pennet Run
Fort Wayne, Indiana 46845 / US
02 / PROCH, Francis, S.
4408 McComb Road
Huntertown, Indiana 46748 / US
03 / CONNER, Nathanael, K.
15810 Grande Willow Boulevard
Huntertown, Indiana 46748 / US
 [2018/41]
Former [2011/10]01 / SCHWARTZ, Herbert E.
11702 Pennet Run
Fort Wayne Indiana 46845 / US
02 / PROCH, Francis, S.
4408 McComb Road
Huntertown Indiana 46748 / US
03 / CONNER, Nathanael, K.
15810 Grande Willow Boulevard
Huntertown Indiana 46748 / US
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/41]Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2011/10]Thomson, Craig Richard , et al
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date09715479.323.02.2009
[2011/10]
WO2009US34826
Priority number, dateUS20080032141P28.02.2008         Original published format: US 32141 P
[2011/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009108591
Date:03.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2291147
Date:09.03.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009
[2011/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2291147
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/30, A61F2/46, A61B17/17, A61B17/16
[2011/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/41]
Former [2011/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:IMPLANTAT ZUR TEILWEISEN WIEDERHERSTELLUNG EINER GELENKOBERFLÄCHE[2018/15]
English:PARTIAL JOINT RESURFACING IMPLANT[2018/15]
French:IMPLANT DE RESURFAÇAGE PARTIEL D'ARTICULATION[2018/25]
Former [2011/10]IMPLANTAT ZUR TEILWEISEN HERSTELLUNG DER GELENKOBERFLÄCHE, INSTRUMENT UND VERFAHREN
Former [2011/10]PARTIAL JOINT RESURFACING IMPLANT, INSTRUMENTATION, AND METHOD
Former [2011/10]IMPLANT DE RESURFAÇAGE PARTIEL D ARTICULATION, INSTRUMENTATION, ET PROCÉDÉ
Entry into regional phase23.09.2010National basic fee paid 
23.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2010Examination requested  [2011/10]
25.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2018Fee for grant paid
03.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2015
Opposition(s)11.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
20.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
MC10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SI10.10.2018
SK10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
IE23.02.2019
LU23.02.2019
BE28.02.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/09]AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
MC10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SI10.10.2018
SK10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
IE23.02.2019
LU23.02.2019
Former [2019/50]AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
MC10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SI10.10.2018
SK10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
LU23.02.2019
Former [2019/47]AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
MC10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SK10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
LU23.02.2019
Former [2019/45]AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
MC10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SK10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/40]AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
SK10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/37]AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
EE10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
RO10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/35]AT10.10.2018
CZ10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AT10.10.2018
DK10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
PT10.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
SE10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
GR11.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT10.10.2018
ES10.10.2018
FI10.10.2018
HR10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
LV10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
PL10.10.2018
BG10.01.2019
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI10.10.2018
LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
NO10.01.2019
IS10.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT10.10.2018
NL10.10.2018
NO10.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL10.10.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0182677  (STD MFG INC [US]; TALLARIDA STEVEN J [US]; EK STEVEN W [US]) [X] 1-29 * figures 1,3b,4a-4c,5a-5d,14a-14c,19c,23-26 * * page 15, lines 21-26 * * page 17, line 13 - page 18, line 14 * * page 26, lines 20-25 * * page 35, line 20 - page 36, line 26 *;
 [X]US2003220700  (HAMMER JOSEPH J [US] ET AL) [X] 1-29 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0019] - [0029] , [0031] *;
 [X]US2005287187  (MANSMANN KEVIN A [US]) [X] 1-29 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0055] - [0061] - [0069] - [0071] - [0078] , [0107] , [0114] *;
 [X]US2001039455  (SIMON TIMOTHY [US] ET AL) [X] 1-29 * figures 1-3,5,28 * * paragraphs [0092] , [0097] - [0101] - [0104] , [0106] , [0109] , [0165] , [0172] *
ExaminationCA2643586