Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2156652

EP2156652 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR NOTIFICATION AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 16.09.2015  [2015/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leeds, Richard
227 Bellevue Way NE, Nr. 543
Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US
For all designated states
Gasper, Elon
12849 SE 67th Street
Bellevue, Washington 98006 / US
[2010/08]
Inventor(s)01 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
 [2010/08]
Representative(s)Nguyen-Van-Yen, Christian
Marks & Clerk France
Conseils en Propriété Industrielle
Immeuble Visium
22, Avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/17]Nguyen Van Yen, Christian
Marks & Clerk France
Conseils en Propriété Industrielle
Immeuble Visium
22, Avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
Former [2010/08]Nguyen Van Yen, Christian
Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date09715488.402.03.2009
[2010/08]
WO2009US35774
Priority number, dateUS2008003959628.02.2008         Original published format: US 039596
US2008033942919.12.2008         Original published format: US 339429
[2010/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009108951
Date:03.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2156652
Date:24.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009
[2010/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2156652
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.09.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/64, H04M3/42
[2010/23]
Former International [2010/08]H04M1/64
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/08]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR BENACHRICHTIGUNGS- UND TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSMANAGEMENT[2010/08]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR NOTIFICATION AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT[2010/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE NOTIFICATION ET DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS[2010/08]
Entry into regional phase14.08.2009National basic fee paid 
14.08.2009Search fee paid 
24.02.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.2009Examination requested  [2010/08]
21.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.09.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2012Fee for grant paid
27.01.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.06.2010
Opposition(s)28.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.03.2009
AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
GR25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
MK25.04.2012
MT25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
TR25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
NO25.07.2012
ES05.08.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
[2015/38]
Former [2015/34]HU02.03.2009
AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
MK25.04.2012
MT25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
TR25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
NO25.07.2012
ES05.08.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2015/32]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
MK25.04.2012
MT25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
TR25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
NO25.07.2012
ES05.08.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2014/32]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
MT25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
NO25.07.2012
ES05.08.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/34]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
BG25.07.2012
NO25.07.2012
ES05.08.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/22]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
ES05.08.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/11]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
IT25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/10]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
CZ25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
RO25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
SK25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/09]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
EE25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/08]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
DK25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
NL25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT25.04.2012
BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/04]BE25.04.2012
CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2013/01]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
PT27.08.2012
Former [2012/51]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
SI25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
HR25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
LV25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2012/49]CY25.04.2012
FI25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
PL25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
IS25.08.2012
Former [2012/48]FI25.04.2012
LT25.04.2012
SE25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
Former [2012/47]LT25.04.2012
NO25.07.2012
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1814296  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0023] - [0029] - [0030] - [0042] - [0106] - [0143]; figures 5,6,16,17 * [I] 2-11,13-31;
 [XI]US2007064921  (ALBUKERK LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0012] - [0028] * [I] 2-11,13-31;
 [XI]US2004120505  (KOTZIN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] - [0027] , [0032] - [0034] * [I] 2-11,13-31;
 [XI]US6400808  (BURG FREDERICK MURRAY [US]) [X] 1,12 * column 3, line 9 - column 5, line 17 * [I] 2-11,13-31;
 [XI]EP1098503  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0017] , [0025] , [0027] * [I] 2-11,13-31;
 [XI]EP0802661  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,12 * column 5, lines 21-31 * * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 1 * [I] 2-11,13-31;
 [A]EP1892934  (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [A] 1-31 * paragraph [0008] *
International search[X]US7310416  (HENDERSON DANIEL A [US]);
 [A]US2006052091  (ONYON RICHARD [US], et al);
 [A]US2006264207  (TAMURA MOTOSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US2004208301  (URBAN BLAKE R [US], et al)
by applicantEP1814296