Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2257562

EP2257562 - OLIGOSACCHARIDE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
[2019/28]
Former [2010/49]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BERROCAL, Rafael
81 rte de Saint Légier
CH-1806 Saint-Legier / CH
02 / FICHOT, Marie-Claire
Chemin du Péage 27
CH-1807 Blonay / CH
03 / SPRENGER, Norbert
Chemin de la Séchaude 18
CH-1073 Savigny / CH
 [2010/49]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/12]Kingsbury, Oliver William
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2013/04]Corticchiato, Olivier
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2010/49]Corticchiato, Olivier
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date09715865.325.02.2009
[2010/49]
WO2009EP52186
Priority number, dateEP2008010197526.02.2008         Original published format: EP 08101975
[2010/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009106528
Date:03.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2257562
Date:08.12.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009
[2010/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2257562
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07H3/04, C07H3/06
[2010/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/49]
TitleGerman:OLIGOSACCHARIDINHALTSSTOFF[2010/49]
English:OLIGOSACCHARIDE INGREDIENT[2010/49]
French:INGRÉDIENT À BASE D OLIGOSACCHARIDE[2010/49]
Entry into regional phase27.09.2010National basic fee paid 
27.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/49]
30.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
25.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2012Fee for grant paid
05.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013   
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
 [2013/48]
20.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.07.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition21.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1879/15
19.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
01.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:28.02.2011Request for further processing filed
28.02.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.03.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.02.2009
AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE25.02.2013
LU25.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
FI25.02.2017
IT25.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
PT25.08.2017
GR06.09.2017
PL25.02.2018
SE26.02.2018
[2020/01]
Former [2018/49]HU25.02.2009
AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE25.02.2013
LU25.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
FI25.02.2017
IT25.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
PT25.08.2017
GR06.09.2017
SE26.02.2018
Former [2018/14]HU25.02.2009
AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE25.02.2013
LU25.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
FI25.02.2017
IT25.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
PT25.08.2017
GR06.09.2017
Former [2018/02]HU25.02.2009
AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE25.02.2013
LU25.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
FI25.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
PT25.08.2017
GR06.09.2017
Former [2017/50]HU25.02.2009
AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE25.02.2013
LU25.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
FI25.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
GR06.09.2017
Former [2017/36]HU25.02.2009
AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE25.02.2013
LU25.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
BE28.02.2017
Former [2015/34]HU25.02.2009
AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE25.02.2013
LU25.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2015/32]AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MK23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE25.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2014/32]AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MT23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE25.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2014/07]AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
IE25.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/42]AT23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/41]AT23.01.2013
HR23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
NO23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT23.01.2013
NO23.04.2013
Cited inInternational search[DA]US2005096295  (MCMAHON ROBERT J [US], et al) [DA] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - C.-F. TEO ET AL., "Synthesis of sialyl Tn glycopeptides - Enzymatic sialylation by alpha2,6-sialyltransferase from Photobacterium damsela", ADV. SYNTH. CATAL., (2005), vol. 347, pages 967 - 972, XP002496043 [X] 1,4 * Scheme 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adsc.200505061
 [X]  - B. NEUBACHER ET AL., "Preparation of sialylated oligosaccharides employing recombinant trans-sialidase from Trypanosoma cruzi", ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 3, pages 1551 - 1556, XP002496044 [X] 1,3,4 * Scheme 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b500042d
 [X]  - D.P. GALONIC ET AL., "Oligosaccharide-peptide ligation of glycosyl thiolates with dehydropeptides: Synthesis of S-linked mucin-related glycopeptide conjugates", CHEM. EUR. J., (2003), vol. 9, pages 5997 - 6006, XP002496045 [X] 1,3,4 * Table 1, last two examples *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.200305290
 [X]  - H. IIJIMA ET AL., "Synthesis of the N-terminal glycopentapeptides of human glycophorin Am and An carrying trimeric sialosysl Tn epitope", TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1992), vol. 33, pages 7907 - 7910, XP002496046 [X] 1,3,4 * Figures 3 and 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)74775-7