Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2259850

EP2259850 - HEEL UNIT FOR ALPINE TOURING BINDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, GB, SI
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc.
200 Donaghy Avenue
North Vancouver, BC V7P 2L5 / CA
[2018/05]
Former [2010/50]For all designated states
G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc.
200 Donaghy Avenue
North Vancouver, BC V7P 2L5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / SHUTE, Cameron, Allan
623 - 7th Street
Nelson, British Columbia V1L 2X8 / CA
02 / MCCRANK, Ernest, Dawson
104, 210 West 13th Street
North Vancouver, British Columbia V7M 1N7 / CA
03 / MOORE, Robert, Erik
5751 Sunshine Falls Lane
North Vancouver, British Columbia V7G 2T9 / CA
04 / PALFREYMAN, Paul, Matthew
172 James Road
Port Moody, British Columbia V3H 2S4 / CA
05 / ROGERS, James, William
545 Sutherland Avenue
North Vancouver, British Columbia V7L 3Z4 / CA
 [2010/50]
Representative(s)Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Flüggenstraße 13
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/05]Bosch, Matthias
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Former [2014/45]Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2010/50]Börlin, Maria , et al
Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date09716177.220.02.2009
[2010/50]
WO2009CA00206
Priority number, dateUS2008006436729.02.2008         Original published format: US 64367
US2008019335820.11.2008         Original published format: US 193358
[2010/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009105866
Date:03.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2259850
Date:15.12.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009
[2010/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2259850
Date:31.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA03.09.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A63C9/08
[2010/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/05]
Former [2010/50]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:FERSENEINHEIT FÜR TOURENSKILAUFBINDUNG[2010/50]
English:HEEL UNIT FOR ALPINE TOURING BINDING[2010/50]
French:UNITÉ TALON POUR FIXATION DE RANDONNÉE EN MONTAGNE[2010/50]
Entry into regional phase21.09.2010National basic fee paid 
21.09.2010Search fee paid 
21.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/50]
02.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2015Observations by third parties
03.07.2015Observations by third parties
08.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2017Fee for grant paid
19.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17001619.0  / EP3305379
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.10.2018  02.11.2018  ADMISSIBLE
MARKER Deutschland GmbH
Dr.-Gotthilf-Näher-Strasse 6 und 12
82377 Penzberg / DE
Opponent's representative
SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/49]
Opponent(s)01  29.10.2018  02.11.2018  ADMISSIBLE
MARKER Deutschland GmbH
Dr.-Gotthilf-Näher-Strasse 6 und 12
82377 Penzberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
15.11.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
19.10.2016Request for further processing filed
19.10.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.11.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
20.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Licence(s)ID:01 01/not-exclusive
For:[AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR]
Licencee:Fritschi AG - Swiss Bindings
Hauptstrasse
3713 Reichenbach im Kandertal / CH
Date:10.03.2016
[2016/24]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
IE20.02.2018
LU20.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
BG30.04.2018
GB30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
IE20.02.2018
LU20.02.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AT31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
LU20.02.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AT31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AT31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/38]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/37]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
Former [2018/36]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Former [2018/35]FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1559455  (MARKER DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,14,15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0035]; figure * [Y] 5-8;
 [X]FR2903322  (SARL BIBOLLET SARL [FR]) [X] 1-3,14,15 * figure *;
 [Y]EP0054928  (WUNDER GMBH CO KG HEINRICH [DE]) [Y] 5 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0199098  (BARTHEL FRITZ) [Y] 6-8 * the whole document *
International search[X]EP1559455  (MARKER DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]);
 [A]WO2007060219  (MARKER DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al);
 [A]EP0199098  (BARTHEL FRITZ);
 [A]AT402020B  (BARTHEL FRITZ [AT]);
 [A]US4674766  (RAMER PAUL C [US]);
 [A]EP1679099  (FRITSCHI AG SWISS BINDINGS [CH]);
 [A]CA2360819  (FRITSCHI AG SWISS BINDINGS [CH]);
 [A]DE2806937  (GERTSCH SKI);
 [A]US5741023  (SCHIELE STEFAN [DE], et al);
 [A]US4261595  (SMIALOWSKI ANTONI J, et al)
ExaminationCH619618
 EP0045698
 US5318320
otherCH619618
 US5318320
 EP0045698
 IT1360160
 FR2613949
OppositionDE2363368
 EP0035951
 US4261595
 CH619618
 FR2613949
 EP0199098
 US4319767
 DE102006032758
 EP0080060
 EP0519243
 US5318320
 AT402020B