blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2259803 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2259803



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3592
14.02.2019 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
14.02.2019 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
08.02.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
29.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.01.2019 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
29.01.2019 French translation of claims Opposition 4
29.01.2019 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
29.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.01.2019 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
16.01.2019 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 4
16.01.2019 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
19.12.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
17.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.05.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.05.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.05.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
03.05.2018 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 120
03.05.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
03.05.2018 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
03.05.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.05.2018 Means of redress Opposition 2
10.01.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2018 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
20.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.12.2017 Amended description with annotations Opposition 114
20.12.2017 Description Opposition 113
20.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.12.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.08.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
29.08.2017 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
29.08.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
19.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.06.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 33
08.06.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
21.12.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
14.12.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
14.12.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 7
04.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.11.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
02.11.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
25.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.07.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
18.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 1
13.07.2016 Claims Appeal 3
13.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
13.07.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
07.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.05.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 4
27.05.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 9
20.05.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
17.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.12.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
19.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
14.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
14.08.2015 Claims Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Claims Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Claims Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Claims Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Claims Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Claims Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Claims Appeal 3
14.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
14.08.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
07.05.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
07.04.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
26.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.03.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 41
26.03.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.03.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.03.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
26.03.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 36
26.03.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 54
26.03.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.03.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
26.03.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
26.03.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.03.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 49
26.03.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
02.02.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
28.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.01.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.01.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
10.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.12.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.11.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
28.11.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 143
28.11.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
28.11.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.11.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.11.2014 Means of redress Opposition 1
07.11.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.10.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 140
22.10.2014 Description Opposition 140
22.10.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
22.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.10.2014 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
20.10.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.09.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.09.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
30.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 84
30.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
30.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
30.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
30.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 3
16.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.04.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.03.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.03.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
10.03.2014 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
10.03.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.02.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.02.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
27.02.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.02.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.02.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
22.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
22.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
22.01.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
22.01.2014 Claims Opposition 3
22.01.2014 Claims Opposition 3
22.01.2014 Claims Opposition 3
22.01.2014 Claims Opposition 3
22.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.01.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
22.01.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
25.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.10.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.07.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
12.07.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.06.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
04.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
04.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
04.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
04.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
04.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
04.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 58
04.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 46
06.09.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.07.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.07.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
26.07.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
26.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.03.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.03.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
29.03.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.03.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 222
28.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.03.2011 Description Search / examination 17
28.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.03.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
03.03.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
03.03.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
17.11.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.11.2010 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
25.10.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
13.10.2010 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
13.10.2010 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
13.10.2010 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
21.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.09.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
21.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
21.09.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
21.09.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
06.09.2010 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
06.09.2010 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.09.2010 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.09.2010 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
06.09.2010 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
06.09.2010 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
06.09.2010 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
06.09.2010 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.09.2010 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.08.2010 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.08.2010 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
06.08.2010 Despatch of copy of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.08.2010 Result of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.08.2010 Result of consultation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.08.2010 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
05.08.2010 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
05.08.2010 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/429 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.08.2010 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
22.07.2010 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.07.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
06.07.2010 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.07.2010 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.06.2010 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
12.06.2010 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
12.06.2010 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
26.05.2010 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
20.05.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
20.05.2010 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
01.04.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
01.04.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
01.04.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
01.10.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 121
01.10.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 106
01.10.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 203
01.10.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 114
01.10.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 195
01.10.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 111
11.09.2009 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 223
27.02.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
27.02.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 6
27.02.2009 Description International Searching Authority 208
27.02.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 8