blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2259803


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.02.2019 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
02.02.2019 New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid
15.01.2019 New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
07.01.2019 New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
24.04.2018 Change: Despatch of interlocutory decision
03.01.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition
31.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
13.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.12.2016 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
23.05.2016 Change: Date of oral proceedings
23.05.2016 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
02.04.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
29.01.2015 Change: Appeal number
29.01.2015 New entry: Appeal number
29.01.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
28.11.2014 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
05.11.2014 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
04.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]
25.03.2014 Change: Date of oral proceedings
25.03.2014 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
25.03.2014 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
26.02.2014 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
28.01.2014 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.02.2014  [2014/07]
22.11.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2013  [2013/52]
25.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
23.10.2013 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
13.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.10.2013  [2013/42]
19.07.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2013  [2013/34]
12.07.2013 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
07.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.07.2013  [2013/28]
07.06.2013 Opposition filed published on  10.07.2013  [2013/28]
03.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2013  [2013/23]
26.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2013  [2013/22]
12.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2013  [2013/20]
15.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2013  [2013/12]
08.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2013  [2013/11]
01.02.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2013  [2013/10]
25.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2013  [2013/09]
18.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
11.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
03.08.2012 (Expected) grant published on  05.09.2012  [2012/36]
01.08.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.08.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
16.03.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.02.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.04.2011 Change - inventor published on  04.05.2011  [2011/18]
29.03.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.03.2011 First examination report
01.03.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.02.2011 Change - extension states published on  30.03.2011  [2011/13]
15.02.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.11.2010 Request for examination filed published on  29.12.2010  [2010/52]
26.11.2010 Change - designated states published on  29.12.2010  [2010/52]
12.11.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.12.2010  [2010/50]
12.10.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
06.10.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
24.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
24.09.2010 Amendment by applicant
03.08.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
21.05.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
12.09.2009 PCT data prior to European publication