Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2259803

EP2259803 - DEVICE FOR PROMOTION OF HEMOSTASIS AND/OR WOUND HEALING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2019Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 13.03.2019  [2019/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ferrosan Medical Devices A/S
Sydmarken 5
2860 Søborg / DK
[2010/50]
Inventor(s)01 / LARSEN, Kristian
Skovdalen 8
Hareskov
DK-3500 Værløse / DK
02 / SABRA, Mads
Jagtvej 113, 5.
DK-2300 København N / DK
 [2012/36]
Former [2011/18]01 / LARSEN, Kristian
Skovdalen 8 Hareskov
DK-3500 Værløse / DK
02 / SABRA, Mads
Jagtvej 113, 5.
DK-2300 København N / DK
Former [2010/50]01 / LARSEN, Kristian
Skovdalen 9 Hareskov
DK-3500 Værløse / DK
02 / SABRA, Mads
Jagtvej 113, 5.
DK-2300 København N / DK
Representative(s)Høiberg P/S
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
[2019/11]
Former [2012/36]Høiberg A/S
St. Kongensgade 59 A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2010/50]Høiberg A/S
St. Kongensgade 59 A
DK-1264 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date09716636.727.02.2009
[2010/50]
WO2009DK50048
Priority number, dateDK2008000030929.02.2008         Original published format: DK 200800309
US2008003249529.02.2008         Original published format: US 32495
DK2008000055616.04.2008         Original published format: DK 200800556
US2008004541616.04.2008         Original published format: US 45416
DK2009000002906.01.2009         Original published format: DK 200900029
US2009014267806.01.2009         Original published format: US 142678
[2010/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009109194
Date:11.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2259803
Date:15.12.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009
[2010/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2259803
Date:05.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/36]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2259803
Date:13.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/32, A61L15/42, A61L15/44
[2010/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/11]
Former [2010/50]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR FÖRDERUNG VON HÄMOSTASE UND/ODER WUNDHEILUNG[2010/50]
English:DEVICE FOR PROMOTION OF HEMOSTASIS AND/OR WOUND HEALING[2010/50]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR LA PROMOTION DE L HOMÉOSTASIE ET/OU LA CICATRISATION DES PLAIES[2010/50]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2010National basic fee paid 
22.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.09.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2010Examination requested  [2010/52]
03.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2012Fee for grant paid
26.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.03.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.06.2013   
Baxter Innovations GmbH
Industriestrasse 67
1221 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
 [2013/28]
12.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.11.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.12.2014
02.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2016Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2017Reply to a communication from the opposition division
03.05.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.01.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
29.01.2019Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition28.01.2015Appeal received No.  T0186/15
26.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
01.12.2016Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
01.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.12.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.02.2009
AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MK05.09.2012
MT05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
TR05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
IE27.02.2013
LU27.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MK05.09.2012
MT05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
TR05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
IE27.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/32]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MT05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
IE27.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/07]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
IE27.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/52]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/48]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/42]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/28]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/23]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
Former [2013/22]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
Former [2013/20]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/11]AT05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/10]AT05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
Former [2013/09]AT05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
Former [2013/08]AT05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
Former [2013/07]AT05.09.2012
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO9013320  (FERROSAN AS [DK]) [X] 1-3,5-15,18-30,32,33,36-38,43 * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 23 * [I] 4,16,17,31,34,40-42,44;
 [X]US2003175410  (CAMPBELL PHIL G [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,8-15,23-30,35-38 * page 1, paragraphs 8,9 * * page 2, paragraphs 11,16 *;
 [X]US2006255053  (LI KWONG F [US]) [X] 39 * claim - *;
 [A]US2006121104  (STERN MEIR [IL] ET AL) [A] 1-44 * page 2, paragraphs 22,24,29 * * page 7, paragraph 110 - paragraph 112 *;
 [A]WO9737694  (IMMUNO FRANCE S A [FR]; BIERING WOLFGANG [DE]; MANSOUR HAMZA [FR]; SCH) [A] 1-44 * page 1, paragraphs 1,3 * * page 3, paragraph 4 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1 *
by applicantUS6361551
 US6454787
    - XU ET AL., BIOMETERIALS, (2006), vol. 27, pages 3580 - 3588
OppositionWO2004108418
 WO2005084650
 WO9013320
    - Xu, T., et al, "Inkjet Printing of Viable Mammalian Cells", Biomaterials, (20050000), vol. 26, pages 93 - 99
    - Roda A. et al, "Protein Microdeposition Using a Conventional Ink-Jet Printer", BioTechniques, (20000000), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 492 - 496
    - Campbell P.C. et al, "Tissue Engineering with the Aid of Inkjet Printers", Expert Opin. Biol. Ther, (20070000), vol. 7, pages 1123 - 1127
    - Campbell P.G. et al, "Engineered Spatial Patterns of FGF-2 Immobilized on Fibrin Direct Cell Organization", Biomaterials, (20050000), vol. 26, pages 6762 - 6770
    - Miller E.D. et al, "Dose-Dependent Cell Growth in Response to Concentration Modulated Patterns of FGF-2 Printed on Fibrin", Biomaterials, (20060000), vol. 27, pages 2213 - 2221
    - Boland T. et al, "Application of Inkjet Printing to Tissue Engineering", Biotechnol. J., (20060000), vol. 1, pages 910 - 917
    - Surgiflo® product leaflet, "Surgiflo® Hemostatic Matrix Kit," 5 pages.
    - Reference 13 of Lewis et al. (Surgiflo Instructions for Use, 2008)
    - de la Torre R. et al, "Hemostasis and hemostatic agents in minimally invasive surgery", SURGERY, Mosby, Inc, US, (20071026), vol. 142, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.surg.2007.06.023, pages S39 - S45, XP022287167

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surg.2007.06.023
    - Ereth M.H., Appl. Cardiopul. Pathophysiol., 26th Annual Symposium,Abstract of Presentation of 22-01-2008, (20080120), pages 17 - 18
    - Hong Y.M.; Loughlin K.R., "The Use of Hemostatic Agents and Sealants in Urology", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, Lippincott Williams & Wilkins, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20061102), vol. 176, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.juro.2006.07.128, pages 2367 - 2374, XP005732634

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.juro.2006.07.128