Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2249961

EP2249961 - ADSORBENT GRANULATE AND METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chemiewerk Bad Köstritz GmbH
Heinrichshall 2
07586 Bad Köstritz / DE
[2010/46]
Inventor(s)01 / BRANDT, Alfons
Zeitzer Straße 94
07552 Gera / DE
02 / SCHMEISSER, Jens
Alte Straße 3a
06712 Kretzschau / DE
03 / UNGER, Baldur
Waldweg 40a
06846 Dessau / DE
04 / TSCHRITTER, Hartmut
Silvanerstraße 4
71717 Beilstein / DE
05 / HENKEL, Uwe
Südstraße 31
07548 GERA / DE
06 / BÁLINT, Gojdár
Siedlungsstraße 84
07586 Bad Köstritz / DE
07 / GRUHLE, Dietmar
Uferstraße 4
07548 Gera / DE
08 / WINTERSTEIN, Georg
Birkenlinie 22
07639 Bad Klosterlausnitz / DE
 [2011/01]
Former [2010/50]01 / BRANDT, Alfons
Zeitzer Straße 94
07552 Gera / DE
02 / SCHMEISSER, Jens
Alte Straße 3a
06712 Kretzschau / DE
03 / UNGER, Baldur
Waldweg 40a
06846 Dessau / DE
04 / TSCHRITTER, Hartmut
Silvanerstraße 4
71717 Beilstein / DE
05 / HENKEL, Uwe
Roben 28
07554 Gera / DE
06 / BÁLINT, Gojdár
Siedlungsstraße 84
07586 Bad Köstritz / DE
07 / GRUHLE, Dietmar
Uferstraße 4
07548 Gera / DE
08 / WINTERSTEIN, Georg
Birkenlinie 22
07639 Bad Klosterlausnitz / DE
Former [2010/46]01 / BRANDT, Alfons
Zeitzer Straße 94
07552 Gera / DE
02 / SCHMEISSER, Jens
Alte Straße 3a
06712 Kretzschau / DE
03 / UNGER, Baldur
Waldweg 40a
06846 Dessau / DE
04 / TSCHRITTER, Hartmut
An der Kastanie 3
07546 Gera / DE
05 / HENKEL, Uwe
Roben 28
07554 Gera / DE
06 / BÁLINT, Gojdár
Siedlungsstraße 84
07586 Bad Köstritz / DE
07 / GRUHLE, Dietmar
Uferstraße 4
07548 Gera / DE
08 / WINTERSTEIN, Georg
Birkenlinie 22
07639 Bad Klosterlausnitz / DE
Representative(s)Kruspig, Volkmar , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Berliner Straße 1
07545 Gera / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]Kruspig, Volkmar
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 15
07545 Gera / DE
Former [2010/46]Kruspig, Volkmar
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 15
07545 Gera / DE
Application number, filing date09717626.727.02.2009
[2010/46]
WO2009EP52385
Priority number, dateDE2008101234603.03.2008         Original published format: DE102008012346
DE2008104615506.09.2008         Original published format: DE102008046155
[2010/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009109529
Date:11.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2249961
Date:17.11.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009
[2010/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2249961
Date:08.04.2015
Language:DE
[2015/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:B01J20/18, B01D53/04
[2010/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/46]
TitleGerman:ADSORPTIONSMITTELGRANULAT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2010/46]
English:ADSORBENT GRANULATE AND METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE THEREOF[2010/46]
French:GRANULÉ FORMANT AGENT D'ADSORPTION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA FABRICATION[2010/46]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2010National basic fee paid 
19.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/46]
24.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2015Fee for grant paid
18.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Bandpay & Greuter, et al
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
 [2019/52]
Former [2019/12]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Bandpay & Greuter, et al
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
FR-75002 Paris / FR
Former [2018/14]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Casalonga, et al
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2017/22]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2016  25.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Schaefer, Anne-Sophie, et al
Arkema France
Departement Propriete Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
Former [2016/07]
Opponent(s)01  07.01.2016   
CECA S.A.
89, Boulevard National
92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Schaefer, Anne-Sophie, et al
Arkema France
Departement Propriete Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
16.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.10.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.10.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition15.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2796/17
28.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
12.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
16.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201305   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.02.2009
BG08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
AT27.02.2016
GB27.02.2016
IE27.02.2016
LU27.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
[2018/38]
Former [2018/30]HU27.02.2009
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
TR08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
AT27.02.2016
GB27.02.2016
IE27.02.2016
LU27.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/28]HU27.02.2009
CY08.04.2015
CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MK08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
AT27.02.2016
GB27.02.2016
IE27.02.2016
LU27.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
AT27.02.2016
GB27.02.2016
IE27.02.2016
LU27.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/40]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
MT08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
AT27.02.2016
GB27.02.2016
IE27.02.2016
LU27.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2017/36]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
AT27.02.2016
GB27.02.2016
IE27.02.2016
LU27.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2017/08]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
GB27.02.2016
IE27.02.2016
LU27.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE27.02.2016
LU27.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/43]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU27.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/42]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/24]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SI08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/10]CZ08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
RO08.04.2015
SK08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/09]DK08.04.2015
EE08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2016/07]DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
IS08.08.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
HR08.04.2015
LT08.04.2015
LV08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
NO08.07.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL08.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP1142622  (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,11-12 * page 4, line 27 - line 28 * * page 4, line 37 * * page 12, line 7 * * page 12, line 41 * * page 6, line 43 * * page 6, line 53 * [I] 4-10;
 [X]WO2008009845  (CECA SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-2 * page 13, line 19 - line 20 * * page 19, line 10 - line 11 * * page 19, line 18 - line 24 * * page 20, line 20 *;
 [I]US5098448  (PUPPE LOTHAR [DE], et al) [I] 4-10 * column 3, line 36 * * column 3, line 28 - line 30 * * column 3, line 40 - line 45 * * column 4, line 45 - line 54 *;
 [A]EP1356862  (BAD KOESTRITZ CHEMIEWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 4, line 8 - line 12 * * page 5, line 1 - line 22 *;
 [A]US5868818  (OGAWA NOBUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 12, line 15 - line 22 * * column 10; examples 1,2; table 2 *
OppositionWO2009109529
 EP1356862
 EP1142622
 US4289740
 WO9946031
 WO0050166
 US5098448
    - "« Hydrite® PXN »", Data sheet, (20010800), URL: xtgchem.cn/up/oad/20110708084109.pdf, XP055276146