Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2263283

EP2263283 - LOADED RF ANTENNA FOR IMPLANTABLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.05.2015
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cardiac Pacemakers, Inc.
4100 Hamline Avenue North
St. Paul, MN 55112-5798 / US
[2010/51]
Inventor(s)01 / DION, Philip, G.
3043 92nd Avenue N.e.
Blaine MN 55449 / US
 [2010/51]
Representative(s)Schley, Jan Malte , et al
Fish & Richardson P.C.
HighLight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8
80807 München / DE
[2014/28]
Former [2014/27]Golkowsky, Stefan
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12
DE-10719 Berlin / DE
Former [2010/51]Golkowsky, Stefan
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12
DE-10719 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date09717702.603.03.2009
[2010/51]
WO2009US01354
Priority number, dateUS2008003353504.03.2008         Original published format: US 33535
US2008008898614.08.2008         Original published format: US 88986
[2010/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009111012
Date:11.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2263283
Date:22.12.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009
[2010/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2263283
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/27, H01Q1/40, H01Q5/00, A61B5/00, A61N1/372
[2010/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/51]
TitleGerman:EINGEBRACHTE HF-ANTENNE FÜR EINE IMPLANTIERBARE EINRICHTUNG[2010/51]
English:LOADED RF ANTENNA FOR IMPLANTABLE DEVICE[2010/51]
French:ANTENNE RF CHARGÉE POUR UN DISPOSITIF IMPLANTABLE[2010/51]
Entry into regional phase01.10.2010National basic fee paid 
01.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2010Examination requested  [2010/51]
30.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2014Fee for grant paid
15.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.01.2013
Opposition(s)07.04.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.03.2009
AT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
MK02.07.2014
MT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
TR02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
GB03.03.2015
IE03.03.2015
LU03.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/39]HU03.03.2009
AT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
MT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
TR02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
GB03.03.2015
IE03.03.2015
LU03.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2017/03]AT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
MT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
GB03.03.2015
IE03.03.2015
LU03.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/32]AT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
GB03.03.2015
IE03.03.2015
LU03.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/12]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
GB03.03.2015
IE03.03.2015
LU03.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
FR31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
GB03.03.2015
IE03.03.2015
LU03.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/06]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
LU03.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/50]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
LU03.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
LU03.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/25]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/23]CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/22]CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/12]CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/10]CZ02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT02.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2006224206  (DUBLIN GARRY L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-21 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0044]; figure 11 * [Y] 4,17;
 [X]US2007288065  (CHRISTMAN TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,10-12,14,19-21 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 *;
 [YA]US2003117340  (SHENG-GEN PAN [DE], et al) [Y] 4,17 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1,2 * [A] ;
 [A]EP0505673  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 2,3,15,16 * abstract *;
 [A]US2007288066  (CHRISTMAN TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *
ExaminationWO0066220