Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2265136

EP2265136 - ABSORBENT PADS FOR FOOD PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paper Pak Industries
1941 White Avenue
Laverne, CA 91750 / US
[2010/52]
Inventor(s)01 / VERSTEYLEN, Sayandro
2920 Mill Creek Road
Ontario CA 91761 / US
02 / RIEHLE, Lindsay, Snowden
11283 Shore Court
Beaumont CA 92223 / US
 [2010/52]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/52]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date09718152.307.03.2009
[2010/52]
WO2009US36442
Priority number, dateUS2008003475107.03.2008         Original published format: US 34751
[2010/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009111768
Date:11.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2265136
Date:29.12.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009
[2010/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.09.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:A23L3/3454, B65B55/12, B65B55/19, A23B4/16, A23B4/22, A23L3/3418, A23L3/3571, B65D81/26, A23L3/3427, A23L3/3436, A23B4/20
[2013/12]
Former International [2010/52]A23L3/3454, B65B55/12, B65B55/19
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/52]
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERENDE EINLAGEN FÜR LEBENSMITTELVERPACKUNG[2010/52]
English:ABSORBENT PADS FOR FOOD PACKAGING[2010/52]
French:TAMPONS ABSORBANTS POUR EMBALLAGE ALIMENTAIRE[2010/52]
Entry into regional phase05.10.2010National basic fee paid 
05.10.2010Search fee paid 
05.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2010Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.10.2010Examination requested  [2010/52]
16.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/33]
21.03.2018Date of oral proceedings
28.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/33]
28.03.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.11.2013
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
03.06.2016Request for further processing filed
03.06.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.06.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
12.09.2014Request for further processing filed
12.09.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.09.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201608   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2016
31.03.201810   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]US2005008737  (KWON YOUNG-WON [KR]) [X] 1,2,7,9 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 14 - page 2, paragraph 16 * * page 2, paragraph 21 - paragraph 22 * * page 2, paragraph 24 - paragraph 26 * * page 3, paragraph 37 - paragraph 39 * * page 5, paragraph 58 * [A] 11,12 [Y] 4-8,10,13,15 [I] 3,9;
 [Y]WO2007067240  (PAPER PAK IND [US], et al) [Y] 7,10,13 * page 1, line 12 - line 21 * * page 4 * * page 5, line 26 - line 29 * * page 7 * * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 4 *;
 [Y]US2004247750  (FINNEGAN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 4,7,8,15 * page 1, paragraphs 3, 5 * * page 1, paragraphs 10, 13, 15, 17 *;
 [YA]WO2006078868  (PAPER PAK IND PPI [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * page 1, line 12 - line 15 * * page 3, line 20 - line 22 * * page 5, line 5 - line 15 * * page 11 - page 13 * * page 17, line 1 - line 11 * [A] 14;
 [A]WO9426621  (JIFFY PACKAGING CO LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,5,8 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2007212968  (BEU RICHARD [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004247750  (FINNEGAN MICHAEL J [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006172048  (ETCHELLS MARC D [US], et al);
 [Y]US4935276  (PAWLOWSKI THOMAS D [US], et al)