Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2252677

EP2252677 - AUTOMATIC DETERGENT DISHWASHING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2013/49]
Former [2010/47]For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DIRR, Penny, Sue
2105 Clareglen Court 303
Crescent Springs Kentucky 41017 / US
02 / CASE, Corrine
164 Assisiknoll Court
Cincinnati Ohio 45238 / US
03 / PERRY, Kathleen, Anne
11333 Toll House Drive
Walton Kentucky 41094 / US
04 / BEGLEY, Pamala, Gail
5561 Ponderosa Drive
Fairfield Ohio 45014 / US
 [2010/47]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/17]Yorquez Ramirez, Maria Isabel
Patent Department Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2011/03]Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London
EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2010/50]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2010/47]Yorquez Ramirez, Maria Isabel
Patent Department Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date09719022.706.03.2009
[2010/47]
WO2009IB50946
Priority number, dateUS2008006944114.03.2008         Original published format: US 69441
US2008019248018.09.2008         Original published format: US 192480
[2010/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009112992
Date:17.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2252677
Date:24.11.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009
[2010/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2252677
Date:04.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:C11D1/72, C11D3/386, C11D11/00, C11D17/00, C11D17/04, C11D3/37
[2010/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/47]
TitleGerman:SPÜLMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR GESCHIRRSPÜLAUTOMAT[2010/47]
English:AUTOMATIC DETERGENT DISHWASHING COMPOSITION[2010/47]
French:COMPOSITION DÉTERGENTE POUR LAVE-VAISSELLE[2010/47]
Entry into regional phase08.09.2010National basic fee paid 
08.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/47]
17.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
25.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2013Fee for grant paid
24.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.08.2014  25.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 02  04.09.2014  09.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Reckitt Benckiser (Brands) Limited
103-105 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB
Opponent's representative
Hewett, Erica Louise
Reckitt Benckiser
Corporate Services Limited
Legal Department - Patents Group
Dansom Lane
Hull, East Yorkshire HU8 7DS / GB
 03  04.09.2014  09.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2014/42]
Former [2014/40]
Opponent(s)01  20.08.2014  25.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2014/39]
Opponent(s)01  20.08.2014   
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
08.10.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.12.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition24.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0566/17
28.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
31.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:25.03.2011Request for further processing filed
25.03.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.04.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.03.2009
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MK04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/32]HU06.03.2009
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2016/28]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2016/27]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2016/25]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2016/12]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2015/14]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2015/08]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2015/07]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IE06.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/48]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
LU06.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/37]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/36]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
Former [2014/34]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/25]AT04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/20]LT04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2005121302  (RECKITT BENCKISER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,7,9 * page 14, line 24 - line 32 * * page 27, line 4 - page 28, line 29 * * page 19, line 13 - line 18 * * claims 16,21 *;
 [X]WO0206438  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 11, line 25 - line 27; example 12 * * examples 7-10; claims 23-29,31 * * page 16, line 29 - line 31 * * page 19, line 13 - line 20 *;
 [X]US2006257596  (CATALFAMO VINCENZO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * paragraphs [0123] - [0127] - [0132]; claims 1,14 *;
 [X]WO0242408  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * examples 1-4; claims 1,14,15 *;
 [X]DE102004020082  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,9,11 * paragraphs [0076] , [0087] - [0097] - [0125] - [0129] * * paragraphs [0148] - [0150] - [0235] - [0238] - [0245] , [0289] , [0290] , [0297] , [0300] - [0302] * * claims 1-15 *;
 [E]WO2009040544  (RECKITT BENCKISER NV [NL], et al) [E] 1-10 * page 6, line 12 - page 9, line 7 * * page 22, lines 2-6,18 - page 23, line 18 * * example -; claims 1,2,10,11 *