Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2277313

EP2277313 - METHOD FOR SYNCHRONISING A PLURALITY OF FORMATTING MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.03.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Enensys Technologies
80 Avenue des Buttes de Coësmes
35700 Rennes / FR
[2011/04]
Inventor(s)01 / POULAIN, Ludovic
C/O Enensys Technologies 80 avenue des Buttes de Coesmes
F-35700 Rennes / FR
 [2011/04]
Representative(s)Cabinet Le Guen Maillet
3, impasse de la Vigie
CS 71840
35418 Saint-Malo Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2011/04]Maillet, Alain
Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5 Place Newquay B.P. 70250
35802 Dinard Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date09719593.726.02.2009
[2011/04]
WO2009EP52255
Priority number, dateFR2008000127907.03.2008         Original published format: FR 0801279
[2011/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009112371
Date:17.09.2009
Language:FR
[2009/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2277313
Date:26.01.2011
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009
[2011/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24, G06F11/20
[2011/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SYNCHRONISIEREN MEHRERER FORMATIERUNGSMODULE[2011/04]
English:METHOD FOR SYNCHRONISING A PLURALITY OF FORMATTING MODULES[2011/04]
French:PROCEDE DE SYNCHRONISATION D'UNE PLURALITE DE MODULES DE FORMATAGE[2011/04]
Entry into regional phase01.10.2010National basic fee paid 
01.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2010Examination requested  [2011/04]
15.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination04.11.2014Appeal received No.  T0200/15
24.12.2014Statement of grounds filed
24.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.09.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
22.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
18.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]  - GRÖNEWALD U., "Das ÜberallFernsehen - Fernsehen überall? Zwischenbilanz einer Weltpremiere", SYMPOSIUM DER DEUTSCHEN TV-PLATTFORM, (20030515), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.tv-plattform.de/download/symp03/map/s03KoMa5.pdf, (20081218), XP002508836 [X] 1-9 * figure 5 *
 [A]  - CHIYOUNG SEO ET AL, "Exploring the Role of Software Architecture in Dynamic and Fault Tolerant Pervasive Systems", SOFTWARE ENGINEERING FOR PERVASIVE COMPUTING APPLICATIONS, SYSTEMS, AN D ENVIRONMENTS, 2007. SEPCASE '07. FIRST INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PI, (20070501), ISBN 978-0-7695-2970-7, pages 1 - 7, XP031116701 [A] 1,2 * page 5, column L, line 23 - line 25 *
 [A]  - MARTINS E. , FERREIRA J., ALMEIDA L., PEDREIRAS P., FONSECA J., "An Approach to the Synchronization of Backup Masters in Dynamic Master-Slave Systems", (20050909), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20050909163954/http://www.ieeta.pt/~jaf/papers/Ano2002/RTSS2002-evm.pdf, (20081219), XP002508837 [A] 3-5 * page 3, column L, line 1 - line 13 *
 [A]  - ANONYM, "Failover", WIKIPEDIA, Wikipedia, (20080105), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Failover&oldid=182285802, (20081218), XP002508838 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *