Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2263225

EP2263225 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR FLIGHT SECURITY AND/OR AIR TRAFFIC CONTROL OF AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.08.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thales Alenia Space Deutschland GmbH
Thalesplatz 1
71254 Ditzingen / DE
[2016/16]
Former [2011/49]For all designated states
Thales Alenia Space Deutschland GmbH
Lilienthalstrasse 2
70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE
Former [2010/51]For all designated states
THALES ATM GmbH
Robert-Bosch-Strasse 25
63225 Langen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BLOMENHOFER, Helmut
Weinbergstr. 12
88690 Uhldingen / DE
02 / NEUFELDT, Holger
Znaimerstr. 5
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
 [2010/51]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/09]DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2013/30]Dreiss
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2011/38]Wörz, Volker Alfred
Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2010/51]Wörz, Volker Alfred
Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date09719779.210.01.2009
[2010/51]
WO2009EP00095
Priority number, dateDE2008101335710.03.2008         Original published format: DE102008013357
[2010/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009112112
Date:17.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2263225
Date:22.12.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009
[2010/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2263225
Date:21.09.2011
Language:DE
[2011/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:G08G5/00, H04B7/185
[2010/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/51]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FLUGSICHERUNG UND/ODER FLUGLEITUNG VON LUFTFAHRZEUGEN[2010/51]
English:ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR FLIGHT SECURITY AND/OR AIR TRAFFIC CONTROL OF AIRCRAFT[2010/51]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE CONTRÔLE DE LA CIRCULATION AÉRIENNE ET/OU LA GESTION DE VOL D'AÉRONEFS[2010/51]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2010National basic fee paid 
11.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/51]
15.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2011Fee for grant paid
21.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11181889.4  / EP2400474
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.05.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.06.2012  27.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Airbus Defence and Space SAS
51-61, Route de Verneuil
78130 Les Mureaux / FR
Opponent's representative
Ipside
6, Impasse Michel Labrousse
31100 Toulouse / FR
 02  21.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
Linder Höhe
51147 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Aisch, Sebastian
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Freundallee 13 a
30173 Hannover / DE
 [2019/03]
Former [2018/31]
Opponent(s)01  18.06.2012  27.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Airbus Defence and Space SAS
51-61, Route de Verneuil
78130 Les Mureaux / FR
Opponent's representative
Ipside
6, Impasse Michel Labrousee
FR-31100 Toulouse / FR
 02  21.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
Linder Höhe
51147 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Aisch, Sebastian
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Freundallee 13 a
30173 Hannover / DE
Former [2017/03]
Opponent(s)01  18.06.2012  27.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Airbus Defence and Space SAS
51-61, Route de Verneuil
78130 Les Mureaux / FR
Opponent's representative
Ribeiro Dias, Alexandre
Ipside
6 impasse Michel Labrousse
31100 Toulouse / FR
 02  21.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
Linder Höhe
51147 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Aisch, Sebastian
Gramm, Lins & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Freundallee 13 a
30173 Hannover / DE
Former [2012/31]
Opponent(s)01  18.06.2012  27.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ASTRIUM SAS
6, rue Laurent Pichat
75016 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Ribeiro Dias, Alexandre
Schmit-Chrétien
Parc de Basso Cambo
4, rue Paul Mesplé
31100 Toulouse / FR
 02  21.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
Linder Höhe
51147 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
Aisch, Sebastian
Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Freundallee 13a
30173 Hannover / DE
27.07.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.12.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
07.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.12.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition16.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0397/16
15.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.01.2009
MK21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
SE11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NO31.01.2018
PT10.07.2018
IS01.08.2018
GR02.08.2018
[2020/01]
Former [2019/30]HU10.01.2009
MK21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
SE11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
NO31.01.2018
PT10.07.2018
IS01.08.2018
GR02.08.2018
Former [2018/52]HU10.01.2009
MK21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
SE11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
NO31.01.2018
PT10.07.2018
IS01.08.2018
GR02.08.2018
Former [2018/51]HU10.01.2009
MK21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
SE11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
NO31.01.2018
PT10.07.2018
IS01.08.2018
Former [2018/50]HU10.01.2009
MK21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
SE11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
NO31.01.2018
PT10.07.2018
Former [2018/49]HU10.01.2009
MK21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
SE11.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
NO31.01.2018
PT10.07.2018
Former [2018/47]HU10.01.2009
MK21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NO31.01.2018
Former [2014/34]HU10.01.2009
MK21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
Former [2013/35]MK21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
Former [2013/29]MK21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
Former [2012/23]RO21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
Former [2012/14]SI21.09.2011
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US6044323  (YEE DAVID MOON [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11,14,15 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 51 * * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 67 * [A] 12,13 [Y] 6-8;
 [X]US2006040612  (MIN BYUNG K [US]) [X] 1,4,5,9-13 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0049]; figures 1,6 *;
 [Y]WO02101969  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 6-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0011]; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2006008087  (OLIVE MICHAEL L [US]) [X] 1-5,9-11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *