Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2252901

EP2252901 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.05.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University Of Western Ontario
Gordon Mogenson Building 100 Collip Circle Suite 105
London, Ontario N6G 4X8 / CA
[2010/47]
Inventor(s)01 / ALFORD, Jamu
1560 Island Dr.
NE.Ham Lake, MA 55304 / US
02 / CHRONIK, Blaine
19 Shetland Crescent
London, ON N5X 3P6 / CA
03 / RUTT, Brian
87 Peter Coutts Circle
Stanford, CA 94305 / US
 [2012/14]
Former [2011/24]01 / ALFORD, Jamu
27 Stetson Avenue
Pembroke, MA 02359 / US
02 / CHRONIK, Blaine
19 Sutherland Cr.
London, Ontario N5X 3P6 / CA
03 / RUTT, Brian
87 Peter Coutts Circle
Stanford, CA 94305 / US
Former [2011/08]01 / ALFORD, Jamu
27 Stetson Avenue
Pembroke, MA 02359 / US
02 / CHRONIK, Blaine
19 Sutherland Cr.
London Ontario N5X 3P6 / CA
03 / RUTT, Brian
87 Peter Coutts Circle
Stanford, CA 94305 / US
Former [2010/47]01 / ALFORD, Jamu
107 Maitland Street
London Ontario N6B 2X3 / CA
02 / CHRONIK, Blaine
19 Sutherland Cr.
London Ontario N5X 3P6 / CA
03 / RUTT, Brian
1017 Wellington Street West
London Ontario N6A 3T5 / CA
Representative(s)Faulkner, Thomas John , et al
Cleveland
10 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/47]Faulkner, Thomas John , et al
Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date09719907.911.03.2009
[2010/47]
WO2009CA00297
Priority number, dateUS20080035541P11.03.2008         Original published format: US 35541 P
US20080035777P12.03.2008         Original published format: US 35777 P
[2010/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009111876
Date:17.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2252901
Date:24.11.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009
[2010/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA17.09.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/48, G01R33/38, G01R33/381, A61K49/10, G01R33/50, G01R33/44
[2012/03]
Former International [2010/47]G01R33/48, G01R33/38, G01R33/381, A61K49/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/47]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR MAGNETRESONANZBILDGEBUNG[2010/47]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING[2010/47]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE[2010/47]
Entry into regional phase09.09.2010National basic fee paid 
09.09.2010Search fee paid 
09.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/47]
08.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2014
26.09.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
02.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination12.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0407/15
12.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.07.2013
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
07.05.2014Request for further processing filed
07.05.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.05.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
08.11.2012Request for further processing filed
08.11.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.11.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
08.11.2012Request for further processing filed
08.11.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.11.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
26.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]US4727326  (KAPLAN DANIEL [FR] ET AL) [X] 1,7,13 * column 2, line 5 - column 2, line 58 * * column 3, line 31 - column 5, line 41 * * column 8, line 1 - column 9, line 2; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US4577152  (MACOVSKI ALBERT [US]) [X] 1,7,13 * column 6, line 12 - column 8, line 52 * * column 10, line 24 - column 11, line 36; figures 1,2 *;
 [XI]  - S.E.UNGERSMA ET AL., "Contrast-Enhanced MRI with Fat Suppression using T1 Dispersion", PROC.INTL.SOC.MAG.RESON.MED. 14, (2006), page 1696, XP002665616 [X] 1,7,13 * the whole document * [I] 8-12
 [X]  - D.J.LURIE, "Quadrupole-Dips Measured by Whole-Body Field-Cycling Relaxometry and Imaging", PROC.INTL.SOC.MAG.RESON.MED., (1999), page 653, XP002665617 [X] 1,7-13 * the whole document *
 [X]  - G.R.DAVIES ET AL., "Quantitative Field-Cycling T1 Dispersion Imaging", PROC.INTL.SOC.MAG.RESON.MED. 13, (2005), page 2187, XP002665618 [X] 1,7,13 * the whole document *
 [XD]  - J.ALFORD ET AL., "Development of a Simulation Tool for Field Cycled MRI", PROC.INTL.SOC.MAG.RESON.MED. 13, (2005), page 867, XP002665619 [XD] 1 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO2004019996  (AMERSHAM HEALTH R & D AB [SE], et al);
 [X]US5144328  (BLAKE DALE [US], et al);
 [X]US5578922  (LURIE DAVID J [GB], et al);
 [T]  - ALFORD ET AL., "Design and Construction of a Prototype High-Power Bo Insert Coil for Field-Cycled Imaging in Superconducting MRI Systems", CONCEPTS IN MAGNETIC RESONANCE PART B, (2009), XP008141069

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cmr.b.20132
 [X]  - UNGERSMA ET AL., "In Vivo M R Imaging with Tl Dispersion Contrast", Proceeding from Intl. Society for Magnetic Resonance in Medicine, 13 th annual meeting, 7 th-13th of May, 2005, XP008141048
 [X]  - MATTER ET AL., RAPID POLARIZING FIELD CYCLING IN MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, (200601), vol. 25, no. 1, page 1, XP008141188

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2005.861014
 [X]  - UNGERSMA ET AL., "Magnetic Resonance Imaging with T1 Dispersion Contrast", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (2006), vol. 55, pages 1362 - 1371, XP007909561

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.20910
by applicantUS4727326
 US4577152
    - PROC. OF THE ISMRM, (2005), page 867