Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2252863

EP2252863 - NAVIGATION DEVICE AND METHOD USING MAP DATA CORRECTION FILES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.08.2015
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TomTom International B.V.
De Ruijterkade 154
1011 AC Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]For all designated states
TomTom International B.V.
De Ruijterkade 154
1011 AC Amsterdam / NL
Former [2012/03]For all designated states
TomTom International B.V.
IP Creation
Rembrandtplein 35
1017 CT Amsterdam / NL
Former [2010/47]For all designated states
TomTom International B.V.
Rembrandtplein 35
1017 CT Amsterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / GEELEN, Pieter
Rembrandtplein 35
NL-1017 CT Amsterdam / NL
02 / THOMASSEN, Erik
Commelinstraat 19c
NL-1093 TG Amsterdam / NL
03 / ROOSEN, Mareije
TT International BV
Oosterdoksstraat 114
NL-1011 DK Amsterdam / NL
04 / NEEF, Edwin
Rembrandtplein 35
NL-1017 CT Amsterdam / NL
05 / KUCHEIKO, Sergei
Leeuwerikstraat 22
NL-1221 LE Hilversum / NL
06 / JONES, Rory
Rapenburgerstraat 91HS
NL-1011 VL Amsterdam / NL
 [2014/40]
Former [2011/01]01 / GEELEN, Pieter
Rembrandtplein 35
NL-1017 CT Amsterdam / NL
02 / THOMASSEN, Erik
Commelinstraat 19c
NL-1093 TG Amsterdam / NL
03 / ROOSEN, Mareije
TT International BV Oosterdoksstraat 114
NL-1011 DK Amsterdam / NL
04 / NEEF, Edwin
Rembrandtplein 35
NL-1017 CT Amsterdam / NL
05 / KUCHEIKO, Sergei
Leeuwerikstraat 22
NL-1221 LE Hilversum / NL
06 / JONES, Rory
Rapenburgerstraat 91HS
NL-1011 VL Amsterdam / NL
Former [2010/47]01 / GEELEN, Pieter
Rembrandtplein 35
NL-1017 CT Amsterdam / NL
02 / THOMASSEN, Erik
Commelinstraat 19c
NL-1093 TG Amsterdam / NL
03 / ROOSEN, Mareije
Nieuwe Herengracht 151 D
NL-1011 SG Amsterdam / NL
04 / NEEF, Edwin
Rembrandtplein 35
NL-1017 CT Amsterdam / NL
05 / KUCHEIKO, Sergei
Leeuwerikstraat 22
NL-1221 LE Hilversum / NL
06 / JONES, Rory
Rapenburgerstraat 91HS
NL-1011 VL Amsterdam / NL
Representative(s)Dobson, Adrian , et al
TomTom International BV Oosterdoksstraat 114
1011 DK Amsterdam / NL
[2014/21]
Application number, filing date09720656.928.01.2009
[2010/47]
WO2009EP50948
Priority number, dateUS20080064609P14.03.2008         Original published format: US 64609 P
[2010/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009112305
Date:17.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2252863
Date:24.11.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009
[2010/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2252863
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/32
[2010/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/47]
TitleGerman:NAVIGATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON KARTENDATEN-KORREKTURDATEIEN[2010/47]
English:NAVIGATION DEVICE AND METHOD USING MAP DATA CORRECTION FILES[2010/47]
French:DISPOSITIF DE NAVIGATION ET MÉTHODE D'UTILISATION DE FICHIERS DE CORRECTION DE DONNÉES DE CARTES[2010/47]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2010National basic fee paid 
12.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/47]
10.09.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2014Fee for grant paid
25.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.03.2013
Opposition(s)02.07.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.01.2009
AT01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MK01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IE28.01.2015
LU28.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/39]HU28.01.2009
AT01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IE28.01.2015
LU28.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2017/03]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IE28.01.2015
LU28.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2016/12]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IE28.01.2015
LU28.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2016/07]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IE28.01.2015
LU28.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/47]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
LU28.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/43]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
LU28.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/39]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
LU28.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/34]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/30]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/24]CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/23]CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT01.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2008019884  (TOMTOM INT BV [NL]) [I] 1-12 * page 4, line 22 - line 24 * * page 5, line 15 - line 27 * * page 10, line 6 - line 10 * * page 34, line 23 - page 35, line 1 *;
 [A]EP1167924  (NAVIGATION TECH CORP [US] NAVTEQ NORTH AMERICA LLC [US]) [A] 1,9-11 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] *;
 [A]JP2004341182  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,9-11 * abstract *