Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2252676

EP2252676 - SPRAY-DRIED WASHING OR CLEANING PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.06.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 11.12.2019  [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/47]For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ORLICH, Bernhard
Wettinerstrasse 15
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / HAMMELSTEIN, Stefan
Otto-Hahn-Str. 131
40591 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / DREJA, Michael
Gut Vellbrüggen 10
41469 Neuss / DE
04 / SCHNEPP-HENTRICH, Kathrin
Kirchgässchen 13
40789 Monheim / DE
05 / KRAUS, Ingrid
Grünberger Weg 20
40627 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2010/48]
Former [2010/47]01 / ORLICH, Bernhard
Wettinerstrasse 15
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / HAMMELSTEIN, Stefan
Otto-Hahn-Str. 131
40591 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / DREJA, Michael
Gut Vellbrüggen 10
41469 Neuss / DE
04 / SCHNEPP-HENTRICH, Kathrin
Kirchgässchen 13
40789 Monheim / DE
05 / KRAUS, Ingrid
Rybniker Strasse 13
40627 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date09722712.813.02.2009
[2010/47]
WO2009EP51676
Priority number, dateDE2008101511019.03.2008         Original published format: DE102008015110
[2010/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009115380
Date:24.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2252676
Date:24.11.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009
[2010/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2252676
Date:16.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.2009
ClassificationInternational:C11D1/02, C11D3/08, C11D3/37, C11D11/02
[2010/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/47]
TitleGerman:SPRÜHGETROCKNETE WASCH- ODER REINIGUNGSMITTELPRODUKTE[2010/47]
English:SPRAY-DRIED WASHING OR CLEANING PRODUCTS[2010/47]
French:PRODUITS LAVANTS OU NETTOYANTS SÉCHÉS PAR ATOMISATION[2010/47]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2010National basic fee paid 
11.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/47]
12.11.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
10.10.2012Observations by third parties
18.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2014Fee for grant paid
30.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14170937.8  / EP2787064
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.08.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.04.2015  20.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4Y 0DY / NL
Opponent's representative
Reijns, Tiemen Geert Pieter
Unilever Patent Group
Bronland 14
6708 WH Wageningen / NL
 02  16.04.2015  21.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
 [2019/50]
Former [2017/42]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2015  20.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4Y 0DY / NL
Opponent's representative
Reijns, Tiemen Geert Pieter
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortstraat 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 02  16.04.2015  21.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2017/03]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2015  20.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4Y 0DY / NL
Opponent's representative
Tjon, Hon Kong Guno
Unilever N.V.
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 02  16.04.2015  21.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2016/12]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2015  20.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4Y 0DY / NL
Opponent's representative
Kan, Jacob Hendrik
Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 02  16.04.2015  21.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2015/22]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2015  20.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4Y 0DY / NL
Opponent's representative
Kan, Jacob Hendrik
Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 02  16.04.2015  21.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
GB-London EC2A 2ES / GB
01.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
23.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.06.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition21.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1649/17
03.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
20.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.02.2009
CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MK16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
AT13.02.2015
GB13.02.2015
IE13.02.2015
LU13.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/39]HU13.02.2009
CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
AT13.02.2015
GB13.02.2015
IE13.02.2015
LU13.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
Former [2017/03]CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
AT13.02.2015
GB13.02.2015
IE13.02.2015
LU13.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
Former [2016/25]CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
AT13.02.2015
GB13.02.2015
IE13.02.2015
LU13.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
Former [2016/07]CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
GB13.02.2015
IE13.02.2015
LU13.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
Former [2015/50]CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
LU13.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
Former [2015/47]CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
LU13.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
Former [2015/46]CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
LU13.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/44]CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
LU13.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/30]CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/23]CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/22]CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/12]CY16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/10]FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT16.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]US4075117  (MORTON EDGAR J, et al) [X] 1-15 * column 5, line 38 - line 46 *;
 [X]EP0139523  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * example 4 *;
 [A]EP0129276  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-12 *;
 [A]EP0220024  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * example II; claims 1-11 *;
 [A]WO9218596  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * example I *;
 [A]EP0753571  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]EP0520582  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * table 1 *;
 [A]US6635610  (TATSUNO TERUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-17 *
otherWO9902637