Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2265699

EP2265699 - ENVIRONMENTALLY SAFE CHARCOAL-BASED HEAT SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2015
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.03.2015  [2015/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wares, David
3212 Summer Canyon Drive
Austin, TX 78732 / US
For all designated states
Correa, Felipe
6000 Shephard Mountain Cove No.114
Austin, TX 78730 / US
[2010/52]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2010/52]
Representative(s)Earnshaw, Geoffrey Mark
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2010/52]
Application number, filing date09722901.717.03.2009
[2010/52]
WO2009US37423
Priority number, dateUS2008004982917.03.2008         Original published format: US 49829
[2010/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009117433
Date:24.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2265699
Date:29.12.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009
[2010/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.09.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:C10L11/00, C10L5/40
[2012/34]
Former International [2010/52]C10L11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/52]
TitleGerman:UMWELTVERTRÄGLICHE WÄRMEQUELLE AUF HOLZKOHLEBASIS[2010/52]
English:ENVIRONMENTALLY SAFE CHARCOAL-BASED HEAT SOURCE[2010/52]
French:SOURCE DE CHALEUR ÉCOLOGIQUE À BASE DE CHARBON[2010/52]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2010National basic fee paid 
14.10.2010Search fee paid 
14.10.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2010Examination requested  [2010/52]
18.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/10]
28.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2007044377  (CORREA FELIPE [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0030] - [0039]; figures 2-5 * * abstract *;
 [Y]US2008000467  (DUDLEY JAMES [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0020] , [0026]; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]US2834661  (CHAPLIN CHARLES J) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 27; figures 1,5 * * column 4, lines 27-35 * * column 4, line 1 *;
 [XP]WO2008049100  (SONOCO DEV INC [US]; HELMS CHARLES F JR [US]; STOGNER WILLIAM ERNEST [) [XP] 1-5,7-11,13 * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 30; figures 11-13 * * page 12, lines 25-29 * * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 2 * * abstract *;
 [A]US1536692  (SCHEU WILLIAM C) [A] 1-13 * abstract *
International search[Y]US2007044377  (CORREA ET AL.);
 [Y]US2008000467  (DUDLEY ET AL.);
 [Y]US4175925  (PAEK ET AL.);
 [Y]US6328028  (CAYSE ET AL.);
 [A]US3010809  (PECK);
 [A]US4240363  (TROY)