Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2249904

EP2249904 - NEEDLE SAFETY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.04.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Poly Medicure Limited
105, Sector 59 HSIDC Industrial Area Faridabad
Haryana 121 004 / IN
[2010/46]
Inventor(s)01 / BAID, Rishi
W-169, Greater Kailash-2
New Dehli 110 048 / IN
 [2010/46]
Representative(s)Thum, Bernhard
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/20]Thum, Bernhard
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Former [2013/21]Schaefer, Sebastian
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Former [2010/46]Schaefer, Sebastian
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date09723050.225.02.2009
[2010/46]
WO2009IN00124
Priority number, dateIN2008DEL067417.03.2008         Original published format: IN DE06742008
[2010/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009116080
Date:24.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2249904
Date:17.11.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009
[2010/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2249904
Date:22.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.12.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/06, A61M5/31
[2013/01]
Former International [2010/46]A61M5/31
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/46]
TitleGerman:NADELSICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG[2010/46]
English:NEEDLE SAFETY DEVICE[2010/46]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ D'AIGUILLE[2010/46]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2010National basic fee paid 
31.08.2010Search fee paid 
31.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/46]
28.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2013Fee for grant paid
10.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11008552.9  / EP2417997
EP11008553.7  / EP2412398
EP14155772.8  / EP2735331
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.04.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.02.2014  26.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
B. Braun Melsungen AG
Carl-Braun-Str.1
34212 Melsungen / DE
Opponent's representative
Akers, Noel James
N.J. Akers & Co
63 Lemon Street
Truro, Cornwall TR1 2PN / GB
 [2014/14]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
23.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
21.09.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.09.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition27.11.2015Appeal received No.  T2201/15
21.01.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.02.2009
AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MK22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE25.02.2014
LU25.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
[2018/30]
Former [2016/32]HU25.02.2009
AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE25.02.2014
LU25.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/31]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CY22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE25.02.2014
LU25.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/12]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
MT22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE25.02.2014
LU25.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/07]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
IE25.02.2014
LU25.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
LU25.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/44]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
MC22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
LU25.02.2014
Former [2014/14]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
NL22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
RO22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
CZ22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
SK22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
DK22.05.2013
EE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT22.05.2013
BE22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
LV22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
HR22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
PL22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
BG22.08.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT22.05.2013
FI22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
SE22.05.2013
SI22.05.2013
NO22.08.2013
GR23.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT22.05.2013
LT22.05.2013
NO22.08.2013
IS22.09.2013
PT23.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT22.05.2013
NO22.08.2013
PT23.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1449554  (BECTON DICKINSON CO) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraphs [0044] - [0045]; figures 2, 4 * [Y] 3;
 [Y]DE4434569  (BECTON DICKINSON CO) [Y] 3 * column 5, line 19 - line 37; figures 7-8 *;
 [A]EP1595568  (BECTON DICKINSON CO) [A] 4 * paragraph [0066]; figure 3 *
International search[Y]US2005277879  (DAGA NEHA [IN]);
 [Y]US2002173752  (POLZIN U F [DE]);
 [Y]US2006235520  (PANNU YASHDIP S [US]);
 [Y]US5172700  (BENCINI ROBERT F [US], et al);
 [Y]US4832019  (WEINSTEIN BURTON [US], et al)
by applicantEP1449554
 EP1595568
 DE4434569